EP3829577 - CLEAVABLE CONJUGATES OF CATECHOL COMPOUNDS AND WATER-SOLUBLE POLYMERS AND METHODS OF TREATMENT USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Serina Therapeutics (AL), Inc. 601 Genome Way Suite 2001 Huntsville, Alabama 35806 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2024/29] | For all designated states Serina Therapeutics (AL), Inc. 601 Genome Way Suite 2001 Huntsville, Alabama 35806 / US | ||
Former [2021/23] | For all designated states Serina Therapeutics, Inc. 601 Genome Way, Suite 2001 Huntsville, Alabama 35806 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENTLEY, Michael 4420 Choctaw Circle Huntsville, Alabama 35801 / US | 02 /
FANG, Zhihao 206 Park Stone Drive Madison, Alabama 35798 / US | 03 /
WEIMER, Rebecca 155 Edenshire Drive Huntsville, Alabama 35811 / US | 04 /
VIEGAS, Tacey 115 Windy Way Drive Madison, Alabama 35758 / US | 05 /
MOREADITH, Randall 502 Springtime Blvd SW Huntsville, Alabama 35802 / US | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Script Intellectual Property LLP Suite J, Anchor House School Close Chandlers Ford Eastleigh, Hampshire SO53 4DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/23] | Script IP Limited Turnpike House 18 Bridge Street Frome Somerset BA11 1BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 19841823.8 | 27.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019US43820 | Priority number, date | US201862711427P | 27.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862711427 P | US201962788790P | 05.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962788790 P | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020023947 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3829577 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/59, A61P25/16, // A61K31/473 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
A61K31/473 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K47/59 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/485 (US);
A61K31/05 (US);
A61K31/12 (US);
A61K31/137 (US);
A61K31/15 (US);
A61K31/198 (US);
A61K31/24 (US);
A61K31/277 (US);
A61K31/36 (US);
A61K31/55 (US);
A61K47/14 (US);
A61K47/18 (US);
A61K47/20 (US);
A61K47/22 (US);
A61K47/595 (US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61P25/16 (KR);
A61P25/18 (KR);
A61P25/24 (KR);
A61P3/04 (KR);
A61P3/10 (KR);
A61P35/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | A61K31/4192, A61K31/4535 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | SPALTBARE KONJUGATE VON CATECHOLVERBINDUNGEN UND WASSERLÖSLICHEN POLYMEREN SOWIE BEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN DAMIT | [2021/23] | English: | CLEAVABLE CONJUGATES OF CATECHOL COMPOUNDS AND WATER-SOLUBLE POLYMERS AND METHODS OF TREATMENT USING THE SAME | [2021/23] | French: | CONJUGUÉS CLIVABLES DE COMPOSÉS CATÉCHOLS ET POLYMÈRES SOLUBLES DANS L'EAU ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT LES UTILISANT | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 17.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2013067199 (SERINA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 31, lines 27-29 * * examples 6-8,29-33 *; | [T]WO2020264505 (SERINA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [T] 1-15 * page 60, lines 1-24 ** examples 3-5 *; | [Y] - DI STEFANO A ET AL, "Antiparkinson prodrugs", MOLECULES, MDPI AG, CH, (20080101), vol. 13, no. 1, ISSN 1420-3049, pages 46 - 68, XP008090700 [Y] 1-15 * page 48; figure 1 * * pages 57-58 * | International search | [A]US5624677 (EL-RASHIDY RAGAB [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 29-39* ); entire document *; | [A]US2015246958 (HAN JIE [US]) [A] 1-5, 29-39 * ; entire document *; | [Y]US2016303250 (MOREADITH RANDALL [US], et al) [Y] 1-5, 29-39 * ; para [0011], [0016], [0055], [0073], [0078], [0096], [0131]-[0132], [0161], claim 1 *; | [Y] - STEFANO et al., "Antiparkinson Prodrugs", Molecules, (20080116), vol. 13, pages 46 - 68, XP008090700 [Y] 1-5, 29-39 * ; pg. 57, Figure 14, para 1 * |