EP3898805 - COATING COMPRISING PETROLEUM COKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TotalEnergies OneTech La Défense 6 2 Place Jean Millier 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/43] | For all designated states Total Marketing Services 24, Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLIAT, Romain 5, impasse des Tulipes 38300 Ruy-Montceau / FR | 02 /
LAPALU, Laurence 3, rue Georges Courteline 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [2024/33] |
Former [2021/43] | Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 19845708.7 | 17.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019FR53133 | Priority number, date | FR20180073124 | 18.12.2018 Original published format: FR 1873124 | [2021/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020128313 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3898805 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3898805 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/04, C08L95/00 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08L95/00 (US);
C08K2201/005 (US);
C08L2555/52 (US)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L95/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PETROLKOKS ENTHALTENDE BESCHICHTUNG | [2021/43] | English: | COATING COMPRISING PETROLEUM COKE | [2021/43] | French: | ENROBÉ AVEC COKE DE PÉTROLE | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 19.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB1285895 (RAFFINAGE CIE FRANCAISE [FR]) | by applicant | FR817510 | GB475387 | FR1591491 | US3802898 | US4000095 | US4028293 | WO2010134024 | WO2012049579 | WO2014095995 |