EP3855790 - TERMINAL DEVICE, BASE STATION DEVICE, AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | For all designated states FG Innovation Company Limited Flat 2623, 26/F Tuen Mun Central Square 22 Hoi Wing Road Tuen Mun, New Territories Hong Kong / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-8522 / JP | ||
For all designated states FG Innovation Company Limited Flat 2623, 26/F Tuen Mun Central Square 22 Hoi Wing Road Tuen Mun, New Territories Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Huifa c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Shoichi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIMURA, Tomoki c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 04 /
LEE, Taewoo c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 05 /
OUCHI, Wataru c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 06 /
NOGAMI, Toshizo c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 19863189.7 | 18.09.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019JP36555 | Priority number, date | JP20180174702 | 19.09.2018 Original published format: JP 2018174702 | [2021/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020059750 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3855790 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10, H04W72/04, H04W72/12 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W72/20 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0626 (KR);
H04L27/2602 (EP);
H04L5/001 (EP,KR);
H04L5/0044 (KR);
H04L5/0048 (EP);
H04L5/0057 (EP,KR);
H04W24/10 (EP,KR);
H04W72/1263 (US);
H04W72/1268 (KR);
H04W72/21 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT, BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2021/30] | English: | TERMINAL DEVICE, BASE STATION DEVICE, AND METHOD | [2021/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF TERMINAL, DISPOSITIF DE STATION DE BASE ET PROCÉDÉ | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2021 | Translation filed | 19.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 30.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/34] | 25.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2017366377 (PAPASAKELLARIOU ARIS [US]) [Y] 2-4,6-8,10-12,14,15* paragraph [0151] - paragraph [0153] *; | [XY] - CATT, "Remaining aspects of UCI multiplexing on PUSCH", vol. RAN WG1, no. Sanya, China; 20180416 - 20180420, (20180415), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1803755, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20180415), XP051426050 [X] 1,5,9,13 * page 5, first paragraph * [Y] 2-4,6-8,10-12,14,15 | [X] - CATT, "Remaining details of UCI multiplexing on PUSCH", (20180217), pages 1 - 5, 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1801733, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F92/Docs/, XP051397714 [X] 1,5,9,13 * 2.4 Overlapped PUCCH and PUSCH transmissions * | International search | [A]JP2018042001 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0023], [0035], [0039], [0202] & US 2018/0020430 A1, paragraphs [0040], [0062], [0066], [0246] & WO 2016/121428 A1 & EP 3253108 A1 & CN 107409321 A *; | [A] - CATT, "Corrections to UCI feedback procedures", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #94 Rl-1809713, (20180824), pages 15 - 16, XP051517063 [A] 1-6 | [A] - NTT DOCOMO, "Maintenance for CSI acquisition", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #94 R1- 1809137, (20180824), XP051516507 [A] 1-6 * , section 2 * | by applicant | JP2018174702 |