EP3858557 - LINK ACTUATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTN Corporation 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOSE, Kenzou c/o NTN CORPORATION, 1578, Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | 02 /
ISOBE, Hiroshi c/o NTN CORPORATION, 1578, Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 19867647.0 | 24.09.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019JP37372 | Priority number, date | JP20180183107 | 28.09.2018 Original published format: JP 2018183107 | [2021/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020067060 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3858557 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B25J11/00, F16C41/00, F16H21/46, B25J9/00, B25J9/16, G05B19/042, G05B23/02 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
B25J9/0048 (EP,US);
B25J17/0266 (US);
B25J9/1623 (EP);
B25J9/1674 (EP);
F16C41/00 (EP);
F16H21/46 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/31] | B25J11/00, F16C41/00, F16H21/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSBETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/31] | English: | LINK ACTUATION APPARATUS | [2021/31] | French: | APPAREIL D'ACTIONNEMENT DE LIAISON | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2021 | Translation filed | 17.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 16.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2006281421 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 3,4* the whole document *; | [X]EP2567795 (YASKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0062] - [0065]; figures 1-12 *; | [X]WO2018029910 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * Embodiment 3;; figures 1-10 *; | [X]US2018207800 (MARUI NAOKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * figures 1-17 * | International search | [A]JP2008040930 (OKUMA MACHINERY WORKS LTD) [A] 1-6 * , *; | [A]JP2013052501 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-6 * , *; | [A]JP2013198942 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [A] 1-6* , *; | [XY]WO2017051866 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-2, 4-6 * , * [Y] 3; | [Y]WO2018029910 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 3 * , * | by applicant | US5893296 | JP2000094245 | JP4476603B | JP5785055B |