EP3739070 - NI-BASED SUPER-HEAT-RESISTANT ALLOY FOR AIRCRAFT ENGINE CASES, AND AIRCRAFT ENGINE CASE FORMED OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Proterial, Ltd. 6-36, Toyosu 5-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0061 / JP | [2023/16] |
Former [2020/47] | For all designated states Hitachi Metals, Ltd. 2-70, Konan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8224 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUI, Takanori c/o HITACHI METALS, LTD., 2-70, Konan 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8224 / JP | 02 /
FUKUDA, Tadashi c/o HITACHI METALS, LTD., 2-70, Konan 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8224 / JP | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/47] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19867795.7 | 26.09.2019 | [2020/47] | WO2019JP37757 | Priority number, date | JP20180181020 | 26.09.2018 Original published format: JP 2018181020 | [2020/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020067239 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3739070 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C22C19/05, C22F1/10, F02C7/00, F01D25/24 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
C22C19/056 (EP,US);
C22C19/05 (EP);
C22F1/10 (EP,US);
F01D25/24 (EP,US);
F02C7/00 (EP,US);
F05D2300/175 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/47] | C22C19/05, F01D25/24, F02C7/00, C22F1/00, C22F1/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Title | German: | HOCHWARMFESTE LEGIERUNG AUF NI-BASIS FÜR FLUGZEUGTRIEBWERKSGEHÄUSE UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE FLUGZEUGTRIEBWERKSGEHÄUSE | [2020/47] | English: | NI-BASED SUPER-HEAT-RESISTANT ALLOY FOR AIRCRAFT ENGINE CASES, AND AIRCRAFT ENGINE CASE FORMED OF SAME | [2020/47] | French: | ALLIAGE SUPER-RÉSISTANT À LA CHALEUR À BASE DE NI POUR CARTERS DE MOTEUR D'AÉRONEF, ET CARTER DE MOTEUR D'AÉRONEF FORMÉ À PARTIR DE CELUI-CI | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2020 | Translation filed | 12.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 16.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4108648 (ZHURKINA GALINA VASILIEVNA, et al) [A] 1-5 * claims 1-4 * * columns 2-6 * * example 1 *; | [X]US2006157171 (UETA SHIGEKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * claims 1-19 * * paragraphs [0009] - [0038] * * tables 1-4 *; | [I]JP2007113057 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD, et al) [I] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2014005528 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [A]US2015284823 (OSAKI MOTOTSUGU [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * claims 1-9 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0110] * * tables 1-2 *; | [A]EP3023509 (MITSUBISHI HITACHI POWER SYS [JP]) [A] 1-5 * claims 1-7 * * tables 1-3 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0081] * | International search | [A]JP2013159842 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-5 * , *; | [A]JP2014005528 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-5 * , *; | [A]WO2015008343 (MITSUBISHI HITACHI POWER SYS [JP]) [A] 1-5 * , & US 20 *; | [A]JP2015129341 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * , *; | [A]JP2015165046 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-5 * , & US *; | [A]JP2015199980 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-5* , * | by applicant | JP2005525470 |