EP3875520 - FOAM PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JSP Corporation 4-2 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAGI, Shota c/o JSP Corporation Yokkaichi Research Center 653-2, Oaza-Rokuromi Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0881 / JP | 02 /
HIRA, Akinobu c/o JSP Corporation Yokkaichi Research Center 653-2, Oaza-Rokuromi Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0881 / JP | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19879789.6 | 02.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019JP38917 | Priority number, date | JP20180204236 | 30.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018204236 | [2021/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020090335 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3875520 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/18 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
C08J9/0061 (EP,KR,US);
C08J9/16 (KR);
C08J9/18 (EP,US);
C08J9/228 (US);
C08J9/232 (EP,KR);
C08L23/08 (KR);
C08L53/00 (KR,US);
C08J2201/026 (EP);
C08J2203/06 (EP);
C08J2203/22 (US);
C08J2353/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2423/06 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | SCHAUMSTOFFPARTIKEL | [2021/36] | English: | FOAM PARTICLES | [2021/36] | French: | PARTICULES DE MOUSSE | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2021 | Translation filed | 22.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 05.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2016155344 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [XI]JP2016160300 (JSP CORP); | [E]EP3970959 (JSP CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]JP2010126577 (JSR CORP) [A] 1-9 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010159321 (JSR CORP) [A] 1-9* , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2013099550 (JSP CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * , entire text & US 2015/0001451 A1, claims, examples & EP 2799473 A1 & CN 104053713 A & KR 310-2014-0119000 A & TW 201336914 A *; | [A]JP2013181157 (JSP CORP) [A] 1-9 * , entire text & US 2015/0102269 A1, claims, examples & EP 2824136 A1 & TW 201402662 A & CN 104159952 A & KR 10-2014-0141585 A *; | [A]JP2018070735 (JSP CORP) [A] 1-9 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2018084245 (JSP CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * , entire text & US 2019/0270861 A1, claims, examples * | by applicant | JPS5122951B | JP2016216527 |