EP3880241 - AUXOTROPHIC STRAINS OF STAPHYLOCOCCUS BACTERIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AZITRA, INC. 21 Business Park Drive Branford, CT 06405 / US | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDREWS, Richard 400 Farmington Avenue, CB126 Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/38] | Chapman, Paul Gilmour Marks & Clerk LLP 40 Torphichen Street Edinburgh EH3 8JB / GB | Application number, filing date | 19885205.5 | 14.11.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019US61439 | Priority number, date | US201862768485P | 16.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862768485 P | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020102507 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3880241 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/085, C12N15/74, C12N1/12, C12N1/20, C12N15/00, C12Q1/68, A61P35/00 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
C12N9/90 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N15/74 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K35/74 (US);
A61K39/085 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N1/205 (EP,IL);
C12N9/1096 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12Q1/689 (KR);
C12Y206/01021 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | AUXOTROPHE STÄMME VON STAPHYLOCOCCUS-BAKTERIEN | [2021/38] | English: | AUXOTROPHIC STRAINS OF STAPHYLOCOCCUS BACTERIUM | [2021/38] | French: | SOUCHES AUXOTROPHES DE BACTÉRIE STAPHYLOCOCCUS | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 10.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015184134 (AZITRA [US]) [A] 11-15 * abstract; page 10 last par.; claims 1-43 *; | [XP]WO2019136207 (AZITRA INC [US]) [XP] 1-10 * Claims 1-4, 8-11, 14, 15 *; | [XI] - MIRIAM MOSCOSO ET AL, "A D-Alanine auxotrophic live vaccine is effective against lethal infection caused by Staphylococcus aureus", VIRULENCE, US, (20180227), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1080/21505594.2017.1417723, ISSN 2150-5594, pages 604 - 620, XP055619262 [X] 1,2,9 * abstract; page 607, col. 1 par. 1, Fig.3; page 616, col. 1 par. 2 * [I] 3-8,10-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/21505594.2017.1417723 | [A] - Eilers R. E. ET AL, "Dermatologic Infections in Cancer Patients Treated With Epidermal Growth Factor Receptor Inhibitor Therapy", JNCI : Journal of the National Cancer Institute, United States, doi:10.1093/jnci/djp439, (20100106), pages 47 - 53, URL: https://watermark.silverchair.com/djp439.pdf?token=AQECAHi208BE49Ooan9kkhW_Ercy7Dm3ZL_9Cf3qfKAc485ysgAAAtQwggLQBgkqhkiG9w0BBwagggLBMIICvQIBADCCArYGCSqGSIb3DQEHATAeBglghkgBZQMEAS4wEQQMjdPblHjADcj-5dvsAgEQgIICh1BYYEWom66oC64gemzXuZcMoVaHB4SU23SZqETk9z1_6E_FLyLWfLWLU56XkR2sCdE1uOOHzSliN8gOzlOa2Wb-j4uS-, (20220704), XP055938167 [A] 11-15 * abstract; page 48, col.1, penultimate paragraph and col. 2, paragraphs 2 and 3; Table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jnci/djp439 | [T] - SCHMIDT CHARLIE, "Out of your skin", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP US, NEW YORK, vol. 38, no. 4, doi:10.1038/S41587-020-0473-8, ISSN 1087-0156, (20200317), pages 392 - 397, (20200317), XP037086866 [T] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41587-020-0473-8 | International search | [Y]US2007110748 (HOOK MAGNUS [US], et al) [Y] 3, 10/(1-3) * , Abstract, para [0003], [0046], [0066], [0110], [0259], and [0310] *; | [Y]US2010150956 (PATTI JOSEPH M [US], et al) [Y] 3, 10/(1-3) * , Abstract, para [0004], [0069], and [0140] *; | [Y]US2016235834 (BOU ARÉVALO GERMÁN [ES], et al) [Y] 4, 10/(4) * , Abstract, para [0014], [0017], [0035], [0115], [0148], [0159], [0183], [0210], and [0373] *; | [XY] - MOSCOSO et al., "A D-Alanine auxotrophic live vaccine is effective against lethal infection caused by Staphylococcus aureus", Virulence, (20180101), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1080/21505594.2017.1417723, pages 604 - 620, XP055619262 [X] 1-2 * . Abstract; pg 605, col 1, last para, col 2, up para, and Fig 1; pg 607, col 1, top para and para 2; pg 608, col 2, lower para; pg 610, col 1, last para; pg 611, Fig 6; pg 612, Fig 7; pg 618, col 1, para 3; and pg 619, col 2, Ref. 43 * [Y] 3-4, 10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/21505594.2017.1417723 | [A] - ZHANG et al., "Inactivation of glutamate racemase (Murl) eliminates virulence in Streptococcus mutans", Microbiol Res., (20160000), vol. 186 - 18, pages 1 - 8, XP029557127 [A] 1-4, 10 * . Abstract; pg 2, col 1, last para; pg 3, col 2, middle para; and pg 7, col 2, para 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.micres.2016.02.003 | [A] - WEI et al., "Alanine racemase is essential for the growth and interspecies competitiveness of . Streptococcus mutans", Int J Oral Sci., (20160000), vol. 8, no. 4, doi:10.1038/ijos.2016.34, pages 231 - 238, XP055619268 [A] 1-4, 10 * . Entire documentation, especially Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ijos.2016.34 | [A] - SHAHROOEI et al., "Vaccination with SesC Decreases Staphylococcus epidermidis Biofilm Formation", Infect Immun., (20120000), vol. 80, no. 10, doi:10.1128/IAI.00104-12, pages 3660 - 8, XP055095942 [A] 1-4, 10 * . Entire documentation, especially Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.00104-12 |