EP3893004 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE, CORRECTION METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/41] | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURIHARA Yosuke c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc., 1-7-1, Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/41] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 19892473.0 | 03.12.2019 | [2021/41] | WO2019JP47133 | Priority number, date | JP20180227780 | 05.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018227780 | [2021/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020116417 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3893004 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01P21/00, // G01P3/38 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
G01P21/00 (EP,KR,US);
G01J1/44 (KR,US);
G01J1/0295 (KR);
G01J2001/444 (KR,US);
G01P3/38 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/41] | G01P21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, KORREKTURVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2021/41] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE, CORRECTION METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2021/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE CORRECTION, ET PROGRAMME | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2021 | Translation filed | 15.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 24.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012078510 (MA YUNQIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [Y]US2014320403 (LEE JUN-HAENG [KR], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0049] - [0052]; figures 1-19 *; | [Y]JP2016125988 (FUJITSU LTD) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 20] , [0 28]; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]US2017089948 (HO HARVEY [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0024] , [0 25] , [0 30] - [0033] - [0 38] , [0 39]; figures 1-7 * | International search | [A]JP2002267685 (CANON KK)[A] 1-7; | [Y]WO2014046204 (NIKON CORP [JP]) [Y] 4; | [Y]JP2014535098 [Y] 1-7; | [A]JP2016125988 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-7; | [Y]US2017089948 (HO HARVEY [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 | by applicant | JP2014535098 | JP2018085725 |