EP3908803 - SENSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAHAFROOZ, Amir Marlborough / US | 02 /
SERRANO, Diego Emilio Marlborough / US | 03 /
JAFRI Ijaz Hussain Marlborough / US | [2021/46] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 19908106.8 | 27.12.2019 | [2021/46] | WO2019JP51459 | Priority number, date | US201962789548P | 08.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962789548 P | US201962789549P | 08.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962789549 P | US201962789550P | 08.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962789550 P | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020145203 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3908803 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/567 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
G01C19/5755 (EP);
G01C19/5712 (US);
G01P1/00 (US);
G01P15/125 (EP,US);
G01P15/097 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | MESSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/46] | English: | SENSING DEVICE | [2021/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 13.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5650568 (GREIFF PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8-15 * figures 1,7,8,9 *; | [X]US6443008 (FUNK KARSTEN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10-15* figures 3a, 3c, 6a, 6c *; | [X]US2016164458 (NGUYEN CLARK T-C [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10 * figures 1-5 *; | [X]CN108955662 (UNIV SUZHOU) [X] 1,2,4,10 * paragraph [0013]; figure 1 *; | [X] - HANSONG ZENG ET AL, "Sensing Movement: Microsensors for Body Motion Measurement", SENSORS, (20111210), vol. 11, no. 12, doi:10.3390/s110100638, ISSN 1424-8220, pages 638 - 660, XP055101340 [X] 1 * figure 6(b) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s110100638 | International search | [A]WO9635957 (DRAPER LAB CHARLES S [US]) [A] 1-20; | [A]US6067858 (CLARK WILLIAM A [US], et al)[A] 1-15,19-20; | [A]US6443008 (FUNK KARSTEN [US], et al) [A] 1-20; | [A]US6520017 (SCHOEFTHALER MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-20; | [A]WO2004083781 (SUMITOMO PRECISION PROD CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 | by applicant | US5650568 | US6443008 | US7543496 | US7578189 | US7892876 | US8166816 | US8173470 | US8372677 | US8528404 | US2016164458 | CN108955662 |