EP3893129 - RECOMMENDATION METHOD BASED ON USER EXERCISE STATE, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Bo Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/41] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19911413.3 | 11.12.2019 | [2021/41] | WO2019CN124483 | Priority number, date | CN20191062730 | 23.01.2019 Original published format: CN201910062730 | [2021/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020151387 | Date: | 30.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3893129 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/9535, G06F16/24, G06F16/242 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
H04M1/72403 (EP);
A63B24/0062 (US);
A63B24/0006 (US);
A63B71/0622 (US);
G06F16/24 (EP);
G06F16/242 (EP);
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
G06F3/0488 (US);
A63B2024/0009 (US);
A63B2024/0065 (US);
A63B2024/0068 (US);
A63B2220/70 (US);
H04M1/72442 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/41] | G06F16/9535 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Title | German: | EMPFEHLUNGSVERFAHREN AUF BASIS DES BENUTZERÜBUNGSZUSTANDS UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2021/41] | English: | RECOMMENDATION METHOD BASED ON USER EXERCISE STATE, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2021/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RECOMMANDATION FONDÉ SUR UN ÉTAT D'EXERCICES D'UTILISATEUR ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2021 | Translation filed | 05.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 02.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/31] | 12.03.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.03.2024 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9741925 (REAL VISION CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 8, lines 9-24 ** page 13, lines 13-20 *; | [I]CN107595257 (JINAN INSPUR HI TECH INVEST & DEVELOPMENT CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0073] * |