EP3913150 - PERIPHERY MONITORING APPARATUS FOR WORK MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI Hitoshi c/o KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD., 2-1 Itsukaichikou 2-chome, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | 02 /
YAMAZAKI Yoichiro c/o KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD., 2-1 Itsukaichikou 2-chome, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | 03 /
SAIKI Seiji c/o KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD., 2-1 Itsukaichikou 2-chome, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
SASAKI Hitoshi Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMAZAKI Yoichiro Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | |||
03 /
SAIKI Seiji Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | Representative(s) | Schön, Christoph Dr. Schön, Neymeyr & Partner mbB Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 19918757.6 | 02.12.2019 | [2021/47] | WO2019JP47026 | Priority number, date | JP20190045388 | 13.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019045388 | [2021/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020183814 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3913150 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/24, E02F9/26, G08B21/02, G08G1/16 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
E02F9/261 (EP);
E02F9/26 (US);
E02F3/435 (EP);
E02F9/205 (EP,US);
E02F9/24 (EP,US);
G08B3/10 (US);
G08G1/166 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | PERIPHERIEÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE ARBEITSMASCHINE | [2021/47] | English: | PERIPHERY MONITORING APPARATUS FOR WORK MACHINE | [2021/47] | French: | APPAREIL DE SURVEILLANCE DE PÉRIPHÉRIE POUR UNE MACHINE DE TRAVAIL | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2021 | Translation filed | 16.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 19.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]JP2018093501 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) [YD] 1-5,9 * the whole document * [A] 6-8; | [YA]EP3386195 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1-5,9 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0076] *[A] 6-8 | International search | [Y]JP2017078315 (KOBE STEEL LTD, et al) [Y] 1-9; | [Y]JP2017523523 [Y] 1-9; | [Y]JP2018093501 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) [Y] 1-9 | by applicant | JP2018093501 |