EP3996388 - MULTI-INPUT DRIVEN LOUDSPEAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 09.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suzhou Rusheng Electronics Co., Ltd. No. 333 Zhong Chuang Road Xiangcheng District Suzhou, Jiangsu 215133 / CN | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Jianming No. 333 Zhong Chuang Road Xiangcheng District Suzhou, Jiangsu 215133 / CN | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 19935876.3 | 23.10.2019 | [2022/19] | WO2019CN112649 | Priority number, date | CN20192112649U | 02.07.2019 Original published format: CN 201921012649 U | [2022/19] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021000459 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3996388 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04R9/06, H04R1/24, H04R9/04, // H04R7/12 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
H04R9/043 (EP);
H04R9/063 (EP,US);
H04R1/025 (US);
H04R1/24 (EP);
H04R9/046 (EP);
H04R2201/401 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/19] | H04R9/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | LAUTSPRECHER MIT MEHRFACHEINGANGSANSTEUERUNG | [2022/19] | English: | MULTI-INPUT DRIVEN LOUDSPEAKER | [2022/19] | French: | HAUT-PARLEUR COMMANDÉ PAR DES ENTRÉES MULTIPLES | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2021 | Translation filed | 23.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 09.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006204028 (LIM SOO-CHAN [KR]) [X] 1,12,14 * figures 2, 3 *[I] 2-11,13,15; | [XI]CN201263213Y (WUXI JIEFU ELECTROACOUSTIC CO [CN]) [X] 1,7,10-14 * figure 1 * [I] 2-6,8,9,15; | [XI]CN204733375U (GOERTEK INC) [X] 1-7,10,12,14,15 * figures 1-3 * [I] 8,9,11,13 |