EP4030689 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS, SYSTEM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Fengyu Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
GE, Cuili Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
YANG, Yanmei Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19947615.1 | 30.09.2019 | [2022/29] | WO2019CN109754 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021062826 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4030689 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/18, H04W4/06, H04W28/02 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
H04L12/1881 (EP,CN);
H04W4/06 (EP,CN,US);
H04W28/0268 (EP,CN,US);
H04L12/189 (EP,CN);
H04L45/16 (EP,CN);
H04W40/02 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/29] | H04L12/18, H04W4/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, -GERÄT, -SYSTEM UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/29] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS, SYSTEM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES, SYSTÈME ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2022 | Translation filed | 12.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 23.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2024 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 04.04.2024 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2018131902 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1,6,10,13,15 * paragraphs [0063] - [0073]; figure 7 *; | [A]US2018338265 (GOEL SATASHU [US], et al) [A] 1,6,10,13,15* paragraphs [0118] , [ 143] , [ 153]; figures 5, 8 *; | [X]WO2019091456 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | EP3700223 [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * paragraphs [0020] - [0192] * |