EP3816520 - SAFETY DEVICE OF A DOMESTIC WATER SUPPLY SYSTEM COMPRISING A STORAGE HEATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DK Service a company organized under the Laws of Italy Corso Sempione, 7 28021 Borgomanero (NO) / IT | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIENGO, Carolina Fraz. Casa Negri 59 28075 Grignasco (NO) / IT | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Aprà, Mario Aprà Brevetti Via Bertola 2 10121 Torino / IT | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 20000358.0 | 02.10.2020 | [2021/18] | Priority number, date | IT20190003410U | 02.10.2019 Original published format: IT 201900003410 U | [2021/18] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3816520 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F24D3/10, F24H9/12, F16K17/00, F16K15/00 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
F24D3/10 (EP);
F16K15/025 (EP);
F16K17/04 (EP);
F24H9/136 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] |
Former [2021/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG EINER HAUSHALTSWASSERANLAGE MIT EINER SPEICHERHEIZZENTRALE | [2021/18] | English: | SAFETY DEVICE OF A DOMESTIC WATER SUPPLY SYSTEM COMPRISING A STORAGE HEATING SYSTEM | [2021/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SÉCURITÉ D'UN SYSTÈME D'EAU DOMESTIQUE COMPRENANT UNE INSTALLATION DE CHAUFFAGE À ACCUMULATION | [2021/18] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 27.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/39] | 25.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9218134U (SCHENK RUDOLF [CH]) [A] 1-16 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 3; figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP0586340 (SCHENK RUDOLF [CH]) [A] 1-16 * page 2, line 2 - page 4, line 36; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0487944 (HERION WERKE KG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 46 - column 5, line 12; figure 5 *; | [A]FR2748541 (MACRIFIN SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |