EP3721738 - SPORT SHOE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/42] | SPORTS SHOE | ||
[2023/34] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salomon S.A.S. 14 Chemin des Croiselets ZA des Croiselets 74370 Epagny Metz-Tessy / FR | [2024/01] |
Former [2020/42] | For all designated states Salomon S.A.S. 14 Chemin des Croiselets ZA des Croiselets 74370 Epagny Metz-Tessy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanat, Marylène 32 Boulevard Pierpont Morga 73100 Aix Les Bains / FR | 02 /
Horvais, Nicolas 63 Chemin de Renandieu 73100 Grésy sur Aix / FR | 03 /
Deroulede, Anne 125 Rue Alphonse Daudet 73290 La Motte Servolex / FR | 04 /
Dugit-Gros, Lauriane 92 Rue Des Recouts 74370 Pringy / FR | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Lapierre, Stéphane, et al SALOMON S.A.S. 14 Chemin des Croiselets ZA des Croiselets 74370 Epagny Metz-Tessy / FR | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 20020150.7 | 02.04.2020 | [2020/42] | Priority number, date | FR20190003837 | 10.04.2019 Original published format: FR 1903837 | [2020/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3721738 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3721738 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A43B5/00, A43B7/14, A43C1/00 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
A43B7/1495 (EP);
A43B13/122 (US);
A43B13/14 (US);
A43B5/00 (EP);
A43C1/00 (EP);
A43C7/00 (US);
A43B13/28 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Title | German: | SPORTSCHUH | [2020/42] | English: | SPORT SHOE | [2023/34] | French: | CHAUSSURE DE SPORT | [2020/42] |
Former [2020/42] | SPORTS SHOE | Examination procedure | 09.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 09.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0651953 (SALOMON SA [FR]) [A] 1-15 * figure - *; | [A]US5692319 (PARKER MARK G [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figure - *; | [A]US2011239486 (BERGER TIFFANY J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure - *; | [XA]EP2580978 (SALOMON SAS [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,9-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0044] , [0 45] , [0 47] , [0 53]; figure - * [A] 3,5-8,12,13 |