EP3657867 - REPORTING POWER HEADROOM FOR AGGREGATED CARRIERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | [2020/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEO, Youn Hyoung c/o 2200 University Ave. East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | 02 /
CAI, Zhijun c/o 2200 University Avenue E. Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | 03 /
EARNSHAW, Andrew Mark c/o 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | 04 /
MCBEATH, Sean Michael c/o 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | 05 /
FONG, Mo-Han c/o 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2020/22] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | Application number, filing date | 20151845.3 | 21.05.2010 | [2020/22] | Priority number, date | US200918065209P | 22.05.2009 Original published format: US 18065209 P | US201030392010P | 12.02.2010 Original published format: US 30392010 P | US201032021110P | 01.04.2010 Original published format: US 32021110 P | [2020/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3657867 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3657867 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10, H04W52/34, H04W52/36 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
H04W52/365 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (US);
H04W52/242 (US);
H04W52/34 (EP,US);
H04W72/20 (US);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04W76/10 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/22] | H04W52/34, H04W52/14, H04W52/36, H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] |
Former [2020/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MELDUNG VON LEISTUNGSRESERVEN FÜR AGGREGIERTE TRÄGER | [2020/22] | English: | REPORTING POWER HEADROOM FOR AGGREGATED CARRIERS | [2020/22] | French: | COMPTE-RENDU DE MARGE DE PUISSANCE POUR DES PORTEUSES AGGLOMÉRÉES | [2020/22] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 23.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10730882.7 / EP2433448 | EP13151125.5 / EP2582189 | EP15172887.0 / EP2945440 | EP17158544.1 / EP3240335 | EP18182273.5 / EP3404968 | Divisional application(s) | EP21215914.9 / EP3989651 | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.01.2022 | AT | 26.01.2022 | CY | 26.01.2022 | CZ | 26.01.2022 | DK | 26.01.2022 | EE | 26.01.2022 | HR | 26.01.2022 | LT | 26.01.2022 | LV | 26.01.2022 | MC | 26.01.2022 | PL | 26.01.2022 | RO | 26.01.2022 | SI | 26.01.2022 | SK | 26.01.2022 | SM | 26.01.2022 | BG | 26.04.2022 | NO | 26.04.2022 | GR | 27.04.2022 | IE | 21.05.2022 | LU | 21.05.2022 | IS | 26.05.2022 | PT | 26.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | CH | 31.05.2022 | LI | 31.05.2022 | [2024/20] |
Former [2023/25] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 21.05.2022 | ||
LU | 21.05.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 21.05.2022 | ||
LU | 21.05.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LU | 21.05.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LU | 21.05.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LU | 21.05.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 26.01.2022 | |
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 26.01.2022 | |
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 26.01.2022 | |
NO | 26.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006019441 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1,7-11 * page 10, line 18 - line 20 *; | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification (Release 7)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 25.321, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070601), no. V7.5.0, pages 1 - 141, XP050367710 [A] 1,7-11 * paragraph [9.6.2.3] * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "UL Transmission Power Control in LTE-A", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-091250 LTE-A TPC, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090318), no. Seoul, Korea; 20090318, XP050338862 [A] 1,7-11 * paragraph [2.1.1] * * paragraph [2.2.1] * | [A] - QUALCOMM EUROPE, "DC-HSUPA impact on RAN2 specifications", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-092156 DC-HSUPA IMPACT ON RAN2 SPECIFICATIONS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090317), no. Seoul, Korea; 20090317, XP050339993 [A] 1,7-11 * page 10, line 18 - line 20 * | [A] - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL, "PUSCH Power Control for LTE-Advanced", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-090738_UL_PC_LTEA, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090203), no. Athens, Greece; 20090203, XP050318602 [A] 1,7-11 * Equation 3 * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * |