EP3686093 - REAR STRUCTURE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE EQUIPPED WITH A STRUCTURE FOR SUPPORTING A DEVICE FOR RETAINING A SPARE WHEEL UNDER THE FLOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/09] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 13/15, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2020/31] | For all designated states RENAULT s.a.s. 13-15 quai Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEIN, Pascal 6 AVENUE JEAN BAUDEZ 60180 NOGENT SUR OISE / FR | 02 /
BIGARI, Claire 37 TER ROUTE DE PARIS 78760 JOUARS PONTCHARTRAIN / FR | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. 1 avenue du Golf FR TCR AVA 055 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 20152443.6 | 17.01.2020 | [2020/31] | Priority number, date | FR20190000670 | 25.01.2019 Original published format: FR 1900670 | [2020/40] |
Former [2020/31] | FR20190000670 | 24.01.2019 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3686093 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62D29/00, B62D25/08, B62D25/20, B62D43/04 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
B62D43/04 (EP);
B62D25/08 (EP);
B62D25/2027 (EP);
B62D29/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/14] |
Former [2020/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HECKSTRUKTUR EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS, DIE MIT EINER HALTESTRUKTUR EINER ERSATZRADAUFNAHMEVORRICHTUNG UNTER DEM BODEN AUSGESTATTET IST | [2020/31] | English: | REAR STRUCTURE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE EQUIPPED WITH A STRUCTURE FOR SUPPORTING A DEVICE FOR RETAINING A SPARE WHEEL UNDER THE FLOOR | [2020/31] | French: | STRUCTURE ARRIERE DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE EQUIPEE D'UNE STRUCTURE DE SUPPORT D'UN DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE DE ROUE DE SECOURS SOUS PLANCHER | [2020/31] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 25.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/14] | 25.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 25.02.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 25.02.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.03.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 25.02.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 25.02.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.03.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 25.02.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 25.02.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.03.2021 | Decision despatched | 25.02.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 25.02.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.03.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US5803533 (SCHULZ ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 6; figures 1-4 * [A] 3,6,8 [Y] 4,5 [I] 7; | [A]DE102013101395 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [YA]WO2014131967 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [Y] 4,5 * page 4, line 15 - page 7, line 3; figures 1-12 * [A] 1-3,6-10 |