EP3736637 - PULL-IN APPARATUS, IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS, SHEET ACCOMMODATING APPARATUS, AND DRAW-OUT UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 SHIMOMARUKO 3-CHOME OHTA-KU Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2020/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHI, Takehiro c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
KAWANAMI, Takeo c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 03 /
SAWASHIMA, Fumiya c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2020/46] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2020/46] | Application number, filing date | 20153559.8 | 24.01.2020 | [2020/46] | Priority number, date | JP20190027867 | 19.02.2019 Original published format: JP 2019027867 | [2020/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3736637 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3736637 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G03G21/16 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
G03G21/1623 (EP,US);
G03G21/1661 (CN);
B65H1/26 (US);
A47B88/40 (CN);
A47B88/477 (CN);
B65H1/266 (EP,US);
G03G15/6502 (CN,US);
G03G21/1647 (EP,US);
G03G21/1842 (CN,US);
B65H2402/441 (US);
B65H2402/443 (US);
B65H2402/51 (US);
B65H2402/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] |
Former [2020/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EINZUGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BLATTAUFNAHMEVORRICHTUNG UND AUSZUGSEINHEIT | [2020/46] | English: | PULL-IN APPARATUS, IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS, SHEET ACCOMMODATING APPARATUS, AND DRAW-OUT UNIT | [2020/46] | French: | APPAREIL D'ENCLENCHEMENT, APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'IMAGE, APPAREIL D'ACCOMMODATION DE FEUILLES ET UNITÉ DE PRÉLÈVEMENT | [2020/46] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 11.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21208684.7 / EP3995903 | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 29.12.2021 | AT | 29.12.2021 | CY | 29.12.2021 | CZ | 29.12.2021 | DK | 29.12.2021 | EE | 29.12.2021 | ES | 29.12.2021 | FI | 29.12.2021 | HR | 29.12.2021 | IT | 29.12.2021 | LT | 29.12.2021 | LV | 29.12.2021 | MC | 29.12.2021 | NL | 29.12.2021 | PL | 29.12.2021 | RO | 29.12.2021 | RS | 29.12.2021 | SE | 29.12.2021 | SI | 29.12.2021 | SK | 29.12.2021 | SM | 29.12.2021 | IE | 24.01.2022 | LU | 24.01.2022 | BE | 31.01.2022 | BG | 29.03.2022 | NO | 29.03.2022 | GR | 30.03.2022 | IS | 29.04.2022 | PT | 29.04.2022 | [2024/20] |
Former [2023/27] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
IE | 24.01.2022 | ||
LU | 24.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
IE | 24.01.2022 | ||
LU | 24.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
IE | 24.01.2022 | ||
LU | 24.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
LU | 24.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
LU | 24.01.2022 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
LU | 24.01.2022 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AT | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 29.12.2021 | |
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 29.12.2021 | |
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/31] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 29.12.2021 | |
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 29.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008117482 (KUSUMI TADASHI [JP]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2008254841 (CANON KK) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2144121 (RICOH KK [JP]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2281764 (RICOH CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-20* the whole document * | by applicant | JP2011037540 |