EP3662871 - VARIABLE MODULUS BODY BRACE AND BODY BRACE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Softarmour LLC 27 Chester Drive Rye, NY 10580 / US | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEN-MEIR, David, Amos 27 Chester Drive Rye, TX Texas 10580 / US | 02 /
SANFORD, Allan 25 Maclay Road Wurtsboro, NJ 12790 / US | 03 /
HUTCHINSON, Richard 231 Congress Street Troy, NY 12810 / US | 04 /
MOWELL, Nathaniel 1298 Route 9P Apt E Saratoga Springs, NY 12866 / US | 05 /
ESQUENAZI, Gibran 12806 Raven Tree Drive Cypress, TX 77429 / US | 06 /
EGAN, Christen 8 Salvatore Court Fairfield, NJ 07004 / US | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | Cordy, Nicole Jessica Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/24] | Cordy, Nicole Jessica Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 20154189.3 | 11.07.2014 | [2020/24] | Priority number, date | US201361957844P | 15.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361957844 P | US201414250163 | 10.04.2014 Original published format: US201414250163 | [2020/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3662871 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3662871 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/01, A61F5/058 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
A61F5/0104 (EP,US);
A41D13/065 (US);
A41D1/002 (US);
A41D13/0512 (US);
A41D13/0543 (US);
A61F5/01 (EP,US);
A61F5/0106 (EP,US);
A61F5/0109 (EP,US);
A61F5/058 (EP,US);
A61F5/0585 (EP,US);
A61F2005/0155 (EP,US);
A61F2005/0167 (EP,US);
A61F2005/0169 (EP,US);
A61F2005/0188 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0066 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Title | German: | KORSETT MIT VARIABLEM MODULUS UND KORSETTSYSTEM | [2020/24] | English: | VARIABLE MODULUS BODY BRACE AND BODY BRACE SYSTEM | [2020/24] | French: | ORTHÈSE À MODULE VARIABLE ET SYSTÈME D'ORTHÈSE | [2020/24] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/38] | 07.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14826980.6 / EP3021800 | EP18176640.3 / EP3395303 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5599290 (HAYES WILSON C [US], et al) [A] 3-12,15 * column 10, line 5 - column 10, line 27 *; | [XI]DE19830559 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1,2,14 * Figures 1, 3, 5 * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 41 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 5 * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 12 * [I] 3; | [IAY]WO2005089176 (STANFORD RES INST INT [US], et al) [I] 15 * Figure 11A * * page 9, line 7 - page 11, line 3 * * page 26, line 18 - page 28, line 3 * * page 53, line 28 - page 54, line 1 * [A] 11,12 [Y] 4-10,15; | [XAYI]GB2460493 (UNIV BOLTON [GB]) [X] 1,3 * Figures * * page 1, line 1 - page 1, line 2 * * page 1, line 15 - page 3, line 14 * * page 6, line 1 - page 6, line 11 * * page 8, line 1 - page 10, line 16 * [A] 11,12 [Y] 4-9,15 [I] 4,15; | [X]US2010116277 (LANFERMANN GERD [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,13 * Figure 1 * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0047] *; | [XAY]WO2011008934 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,13,14 * Figures 2, 3 * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * [A] 11,12 [Y] 4-10,15; | [A]US2011155141 (SAWYER LAWRENCE H [US], et al) [A] 3-12,15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] ** paragraph [0008] * |