EP3699357 - WORK TRAIN COMPRISING A SELF-PROPELLED SOIL WORKING MACHINE AND AT LEAST ONE OTHER SELF-PROPELLED VEHICLE, WITH AN AUTOMATED DISTANCE MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/35] | WORK TRAIN COMPRISING TWO SOIL WORKING MACHINES WITH AN AUTOMATED DISTANCE MONITORING | ||
[2021/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wirtgen GmbH Reinhard-Wirtgen-Strasse 2 53578 Windhagen / DE | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRITZ, Matthias Geistingerstraße 131 53773 Hennef / DE | 02 /
LANGE, Herbert Birkenhang 7 51491 Overath / DE | 03 /
PEES, Marc Im Großen Boden 2 56589 Niederbreitbach / DE | 04 /
KANIA, Carmen Kesselscheid 8 53809 Ruppichteroth / DE | [2021/29] |
Former [2020/35] | 01 /
Fritz, Matthias Geistingerstraße 131 53773 Hennef / DE | ||
02 /
Lange, Herbert Birkenhang 7 51491 Overath / DE | |||
03 /
Pees, Marc Im Großen Boden 2 56589 Niederbreitbach / DE | |||
04 /
Kania, Carmen Kesselscheid 8 53809 Ruppichteroth / DE | Representative(s) | Ruttensperger Lachnit Trossin Gomoll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Arnulfstraße 58 80335 München / DE | [2020/35] | Application number, filing date | 20157903.4 | 18.02.2020 | [2020/35] | Priority number, date | DE201910104218 | 19.02.2019 Original published format: DE102019104218 | [2020/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3699357 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3699357 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E01C19/00, E01C19/48, E01C23/088, G05D1/02, H04W4/38, H04W4/46 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
E01C19/004 (EP);
E01C19/00 (CN);
B60W30/165 (US);
B60W10/04 (US);
B60W10/18 (US);
E01C19/006 (CN);
E01C19/48 (EP,CN);
E01C19/4886 (CN);
E01C21/00 (CN);
G05D1/024 (EP);
G05D1/0259 (EP);
G05D1/0293 (EP);
H04W4/38 (EP);
H04W4/46 (EP);
B60T2201/02 (US);
B60W2300/17 (US);
B60W2510/06 (US);
B60W2510/18 (US);
B60W2520/10 (US);
B60W2520/14 (US);
B60W2520/16 (US);
B60W2554/802 (US);
E01C23/065 (US);
E01C23/088 (EP);
E01C2301/04 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/35] | E01C19/00, E01C19/48, E01C23/088, G05D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] |
Former [2020/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ARBEITSZUG, UMFASSEND EINE SELBSTFAHRENDE BODENBEARBEITUNGSMASCHINE UND WENIGSTENS EIN WEITERES SELBSTFAHRENDES FAHRZEUG, MIT EINER AUTOMATISIERTEN ABSTANDSÜBERWACHUNG | [2021/28] | English: | WORK TRAIN COMPRISING A SELF-PROPELLED SOIL WORKING MACHINE AND AT LEAST ONE OTHER SELF-PROPELLED VEHICLE, WITH AN AUTOMATED DISTANCE MONITORING | [2021/28] | French: | TRAIN DE TRAVAUX, COMPRENANT UNE MACHINE AUTOPROPULSÉE DE TRAITEMENT DU SOL ET AU MOINS UN AUTRE VÉHICULE AUTOPROPULSÉ, AVEC UNE SURVEILLANCE AUTOMATISÉE DES DISTANCES | [2021/28] |
Former [2020/35] | ARBEITSZUG, UMFASSEND ZWEI BODENBEARBEITUNGSMASCHINEN MIT EINER AUTOMATISIERTEN ABSTANDSÜBERWACHUNG | ||
Former [2020/35] | WORK TRAIN COMPRISING TWO SOIL WORKING MACHINES WITH AN AUTOMATED DISTANCE MONITORING | ||
Former [2020/35] | TRAIN DE TRAVAUX, COMPRENANT DEUX MACHINES DE TRAITEMENT DU SOL AVEC UNE SURVEILLANCE AUTOMATISÉE DES DISTANCES | Examination procedure | 21.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 21.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.07.2021 | CY | 21.07.2021 | CZ | 21.07.2021 | DK | 21.07.2021 | EE | 21.07.2021 | ES | 21.07.2021 | FI | 21.07.2021 | HR | 21.07.2021 | IT | 21.07.2021 | LT | 21.07.2021 | LV | 21.07.2021 | MC | 21.07.2021 | NL | 21.07.2021 | PL | 21.07.2021 | RO | 21.07.2021 | RS | 21.07.2021 | SE | 21.07.2021 | SI | 21.07.2021 | SK | 21.07.2021 | SM | 21.07.2021 | BG | 21.10.2021 | NO | 21.10.2021 | GR | 22.10.2021 | IS | 21.11.2021 | PT | 22.11.2021 | IE | 18.02.2022 | LU | 18.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | [2024/20] |
Former [2023/10] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 18.02.2022 | ||
LU | 18.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 18.02.2022 | ||
LU | 18.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
LU | 18.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 21.07.2021 | |
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 21.07.2021 | |
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 21.07.2021 | |
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | ES | 21.07.2021 | |
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 21.07.2021 | |
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 21.07.2021 | |
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 21.07.2021 | |
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2018142427 (TKACHENKO OLEG [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * figures 4-7 * * paragraphs [0046] , [0048] , [0049] ** the whole document * | by applicant | US2018142427 |