EP3706525 - STANDARDIZED HOT-PLUGGABLE TRANSCEIVING UNIT WITH HEAT DISSIPATION CAPABILITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Riedel Communcations Canada Inc. 4100-1155 Boul. René-Lévesque O. Montréal, Québec H3B 3V2 / CA | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAVOIE, Renaud 1462, Antoine-Dalmas Laval Québec H7Y2A7 / CA | 02 /
DUDEMAINE, Eric 129, 23e rue Crabtree, Québec J0K1B0 / CA | 03 /
VALLEE, Yannick 640, 4e Rang Saint-Calixte Québec J0K1Z0 / CA | [2020/46] |
Former [2020/37] | 01 /
LAVOIE, Renaud 1462, Antoine-Dalmas Laval Québec H7Y2A7 / CA | ||
02 /
DUDEMAINE, Eric 340 1ere Avenue Crabtree Québec J0K1B0 / CA | |||
03 /
VELLEE, Yannick 640, 4e Rang Saint-Calixte Québec J0K1Z0 / CA | Representative(s) | Roche, von Westernhagen & Ehresmann Patentanwaltskanzlei Mäuerchen 16 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 20160144.0 | 28.02.2020 | [2020/37] | Priority number, date | US201916292443 | 05.03.2019 Original published format: US201916292443 | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3706525 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3706525 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, G02B6/42 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
H05K7/20418 (EP);
H05K5/026 (US);
F28F13/00 (US);
F28F21/02 (US);
F28F21/085 (US);
G02B6/4246 (EP);
G02B6/4269 (EP);
H05K7/20163 (US);
H05K7/2039 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STANDARDISIERTE HEISSSTECKBARE SENDE- UND EMPFANGSEINHEIT MIT WÄRMEABLEITUNG | [2020/37] | English: | STANDARDIZED HOT-PLUGGABLE TRANSCEIVING UNIT WITH HEAT DISSIPATION CAPABILITIES | [2020/37] | French: | UNITÉ D'ÉMISSION-RÉCEPTION STANDARDISÉE ENFICHABLE À CHAUD AYANT DES CAPACITÉS DE DISSIPATION DE LA CHALEUR | [2020/37] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/43] | 10.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016211623 (SHARF ALEX MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0050] * * figures 1-6 * [I] 5; | [XI]US2003169983 (BRANCH SCOTT MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,8 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0028] * * figures 1-5 * [I] 4,6,7,9; | [XI]US2015201528 (LEBO STEPHEN KENT [US], et al) [X] 10-14 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0081] * * figures 2-41 * [I] 15; | [XI]US2016211626 (LONG RICHARD JAMES [US], et al) [X] 10,11,13-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0038] * * figures 1-5 * [I] 12; | [XAI]US2006185876 (AVIV SOFFER [IL]) [X] 10-12,15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0134] * * paragraph [0138] * * paragraph [0151] - paragraph [0152] * * paragraph [0162] - paragraph [0171] * * paragraph [0193] - paragraph [0206] * * paragraph [0322] - paragraph [0323] * * figures 1-4,6-11,15 * [A] 14 [I] 13 |