EP3876374 - OVERVOLTAGE PROTECTION FOR HV BUSHING TEST TAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Energy Ltd Brown-Boveri-Strasse 5 8050 Zürich / CH | [2023/50] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states Hitachi Energy Switzerland AG Bruggerstrasse 72 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2021/36] | For all designated states ABB Power Grids Switzerland AG Bruggerstrasse 72 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANSSON, Kenneth Marknadsvägen 163, Lgh 1302 183 78 Täby / SE | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 20160556.5 | 03.03.2020 | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3876374 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/04, H02H9/06, G01R31/12 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
H02H9/041 (EP,KR);
H02H9/06 (EP,KR,US);
G01R31/1254 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] |
Former [2021/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERSPANNUNGSSCHUTZ FÜR EINEN HOCHSPANNUNGSDURCHFÜHRUNGSMESSANSCHLUSS | [2021/36] | English: | OVERVOLTAGE PROTECTION FOR HV BUSHING TEST TAP | [2021/36] | French: | PROTECTION CONTRE LES SURTENSIONS POUR ROBINET DE TEST DE TRAVERSÉE HAUTE TENSION | [2021/36] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 08.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6226166 (GUMLEY JOHN RICHARD [AU], et al); | [Y]US2004070913 (MACANDA CHRISTIAN [FR]); | [Y]WO2013178168 (ZTE CORP [CN]) | by applicant | US9557349 |