EP3709442 - ANTENNA FOR RAILWAY VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Transport Technologies 48 rue Albert Dhalenne 93400 Saint-Ouen-sur Seine / FR | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIDOMENICO, Dale 440 Mosswood Blvd Indialantic, FL 32903 / US | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 20161901.2 | 09.03.2020 | [2020/38] | Priority number, date | US201916298693 | 11.03.2019 Original published format: US201916298693 | [2020/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3709442 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q15/00, H01Q19/10, H01Q1/32, H01Q21/06 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
H01Q15/006 (EP,US);
H01Q1/3275 (EP,US);
H01Q1/3216 (US);
H01Q1/48 (US);
H01Q15/0006 (US);
H01Q19/10 (US);
H01Q19/108 (EP);
H01Q21/062 (EP);
H01Q9/16 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] |
Former [2020/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTENNE FÜR SCHIENENFAHRZEUGE | [2020/38] | English: | ANTENNA FOR RAILWAY VEHICLES | [2020/38] | French: | ANTENNE POUR VÉHICULES FERROVIAIRES | [2020/38] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 14.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/35] | 08.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2021/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010060534 (OODACHI NORIAKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0007] , [0024] , [0027] , [0038] , [0056] - [0068]; figures 1,5a,5b,6 * [I] 3,4,6,9-11; | [XI] - BEST S ET AL, "Design of a broadband dipole in close proximity to an EBG ground plane", IEEE ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20081201), vol. 50, no. 6, doi:10.1109/MAP.2008.4768923, ISSN 1045-9243, pages 52 - 64, XP011267285 [X] 1-3,5,7 * abstract, 1. Introduction : page 52, col. 1 and page 53, col. 3, third paragraph; 2. A straight wire dipole over the EBG ground plane. * [I] 6,9-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MAP.2008.4768923 | [XI] - Yahya Rahmat-Samii ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF COMPLEX ARTIFICIAL GROUND PLANES IN ANTENNA ENGINEERING", Metamaterials: Physics and Engineering Explorations, Hoboken, NJ, USA, John Wiley & Sons, (20060920), pages 313 - 349, doi:10.1002/0471784192.ch12, ISBN 978-0-47-176102-0, XP055023925 [X] 1,2,5 * page 313 - page 317 * * from page 329 : point 12.4.2.1; from page 339 : point 12.4.4.2; from page 344 : last paragraph to page 346 for figure 12.25. * [I] 3,4,6,10,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/0471784192.ch12 | [XI] - ZHIGANG XIAO ET AL, "A Double-sided Printed Dipole Array with an Electromagnetic Band-Gap Reflector", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF INFRARED AND MILLIMETER WAVES, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE, (20090212), vol. 30, no. 5, ISSN 1572-9559, pages 423 - 431, XP019677106 [X] 1,2,5 * I. introduction; II. double-sided printed dipole array above an EBG reflector and V. conclusion * [I] 3,4,6-11 | [XI] - KIM ILKYU ET AL, "Electromagnetic band gap-dipole sub-array antennas creating an enhanced tilted beams for future base station", IET MICROWAVES, ANTENNAS & PROPAGATION, THE INSTITUTION OF ENGINEERING AND TECHNOLOGY, UNITED KINGDOM, (20150319), vol. 9, no. 4, doi:10.1049/IET-MAP.2014.0104, ISSN 1751-8725, pages 319 - 327, XP006051585 [X] 1,2,5 * the whole document * [I] 3,4,6,10,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/iet-map.2014.0104 |