blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3715719

EP3715719 - COOKING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.08.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  28.08.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2021Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.09.2021  [2021/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Miele & Cie. KG
Carl-Miele-Straße 29
33332 Gütersloh / DE
[2020/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Nelson, Helge
Miele & Cie. KG (DE), OE/KEW
Allensteiner Straße 18
48231 Warendorf / DE
 [2020/40]
Application number, filing date20163295.716.03.2020
[2020/40]
Priority number, dateDE20191010773326.03.2019         Original published format: DE102019107733
[2020/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3715719
Date:30.09.2020
Language:DE
[2020/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2020
ClassificationIPC:F24C7/08, G01K1/02
[2020/40]
CPC:
F24C7/085 (EP); G01K1/026 (EP); G01K2207/06 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GARGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES GARGERÄTES[2020/40]
English:COOKING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME[2020/40]
French:APPAREIL DE CUISSON ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN APPAREIL DE CUISSON[2020/40]
Examination procedure31.03.2021Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2021/38]
10.05.2021Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2021/38]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2018324908  (DENKER DENNIS [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0136] , [0139] , [0141] , [0152] , [0153]; figure 9 * [I] 5,6,10;
 [A]DE102011050123  (CUCINIALE AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US6753027  (GREINER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.