EP3722658 - LIGHTING APPARATUS COMPRISING A DIRECTED LIGHT BEAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simes S.p.A. Via G. Pastore, 2/4 25040 Nigoline di Corte Franca, Brescia / IT | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOTTI, Roberto c/o SIMES S.p.A. Via Giulio Pastore, 2/4 Frazione Nigoline I-25040 Corte Franca, BRESCIA / IT | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Gualeni, Nadia Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [2020/42] | Application number, filing date | 20165575.0 | 25.03.2020 | [2020/42] | Priority number, date | IT20190005360 | 08.04.2019 Original published format: IT201900005360 | [2020/42] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3722658 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F21S6/00, F21V14/06, F21V17/02, F21V21/30, F21V21/116 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
F21V17/02 (EP);
F21S6/002 (EP);
F21V14/06 (EP);
F21V21/116 (EP);
F21V21/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] |
Former [2020/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSGERÄT MIT EINEM AUSRICHTBAREN LICHTSTRAHL | [2020/42] | English: | LIGHTING APPARATUS COMPRISING A DIRECTED LIGHT BEAM | [2020/42] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉCLAIRAGE COMPRENANT UN FAISCEAU LUMINEUX DIRIGÉ | [2020/42] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 08.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB1194895 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED [GB]) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-3 * [A] 4-7,10,11; | [X]US2007195520 (O'BRIEN CHARLES D [US]) [X] 1,3,8,9* figure - *; | [XA]US2011063828 (KU CHIN-LONG [TW], et al) [X] 1,8,9 * figures 1-5 * [A] 2-7,10,11; | [X]EP3336422 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,8,9 * figures 1-9 *; | [X]US2018172253 (CHUNG FU-CHIN [TW]) [X] 1 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US10161581 (CHIU TSAN-LI [TW], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1-5 * |