EP3722659 - ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR FORMING A LAMP INCORPORATED IN A PLASTERBOARD WALL OR IN A WALL TO BE CLAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simes S.p.A. Via G. Pastore, 2/4 25040 Nigoline di Corte Franca, Brescia / IT | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOTTI, Roberto c/o SIMES S.p.A. Via Giulio Pastore, 2/4 Frazione Nigoline I-25040 Corte Franca, BRESCIA / IT | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Chimini, Francesco Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [2020/42] | Application number, filing date | 20165580.0 | 25.03.2020 | [2020/42] | Priority number, date | IT20190005364 | 08.04.2019 Original published format: IT201900005364 | [2020/42] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3722659 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/02, F21S4/28, F21V7/05, F21V7/10, F21V21/04, F21V15/01, // F21Y115/10, F21Y103/10 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
F21S8/024 (EP);
F21S4/28 (EP);
F21V15/013 (EP);
F21V21/041 (EP);
F21V7/05 (EP);
F21V7/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] |
Former [2020/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONTAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BILDEN EINER LAMPE, DIE IN EINER PLASTERBOARD-WAND ODER IN EINER ZU VERKLEIDENDEN WAND EINGEBAUT IST | [2020/42] | English: | ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR FORMING A LAMP INCORPORATED IN A PLASTERBOARD WALL OR IN A WALL TO BE CLAD | [2020/42] | French: | ENSEMBLE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FORMER UNE LAMPE INCORPORÉE DANS UN MUR EN PLAQUE DE PLÂTRE OU DANS UN MUR À PLAQUER | [2020/42] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 08.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2375151 (HIERZER ANDREAS [AT]) [I] 1-3,5-7 * figure 3 *; | [I]WO2011151272 (GUNST STEPHAN [BE], et al) [I] 1-3,5-10 * figures 4a,4b,5b *; | [A]US2015226401 (FERRIER DAVID JAMES [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1a,1b,2,3 ** paragraphs [0025] , [0026] , [0029] , [0036] , [0040] , [0041] *; | [XI]US2018238534 (BIANCHI NEREO [IT]) [X] 1,5-8 * figures 1,2,4,7,9 * [I] 2,3,9,10; | [A]EP3374694 (SIMES [IT]) [A] 1-10 * figures 4a, 7,10a * |