EP3722582 - CONTROL SYSTEM FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, AND INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Daiki C/O Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
KURODA, Ryusuke C/O Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
IDOGAWA, Masanao C/O Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/42] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20168714.2 | 08.04.2020 | [2020/42] | Priority number, date | JP20190074837 | 10.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019074837 | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3722582 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/30, F02D41/22, F02D41/00 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
F02D41/3094 (EP,US);
F02M65/00 (CN);
F02D41/062 (US);
F02D41/009 (EP);
F02D41/22 (CN);
F02D41/222 (EP,US);
F02D41/2441 (US);
F02D41/2477 (US);
F02M65/003 (CN);
F02D2041/001 (EP,US);
F02D2041/0092 (EP);
F02D2041/223 (EP,US);
F02D2041/224 (CN);
F02D2200/0602 (EP);
F02D2200/0604 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE SOWIE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2020/42] | English: | CONTROL SYSTEM FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, AND INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2020/42] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE POUR MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE ET MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2020/42] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 14.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/09] | 11.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005105860 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US2006225695 (FUKASAWA OSAMU [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0039] *; | [A]JP2008057386 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 1-6* figures 1,2 *; | [A]JP2010090901 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0024] , [0 25] *; | [A]DE102015216016 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0024] - [0030] * | by applicant | JPH07293301 |