EP3726431 - OPTICAL CHARACTER RECOGNITION ERROR CORRECTION BASED ON VISUAL AND TEXTUAL CONTENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABEDINI, Mani Building W7, Block B, P O Box 11549 Dubai Airport Free Zone Dubai / AE | 02 /
NAJAFZADEH, Haleh Building W7, Block B, P O Box 11549 Dubai Airport Free Zone Dubai / AE | 03 /
DESHMUKH, Dinakar 2630 Glendale-Milford Road Evendale, Ohio 45241 / US | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 20168901.5 | 09.04.2020 | [2020/43] | Priority number, date | US201916383971 | 15.04.2019 Original published format: US201916383971 | [2020/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3726431 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/62, G06K9/32, G06K9/00 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06V40/33 (CN);
G06F17/15 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N3/04 (US);
G06N3/044 (CN);
G06N3/045 (CN);
G06V20/63 (EP,US);
G06V30/153 (US);
G06V30/1916 (EP,US);
G06V30/19173 (EP,US);
G06V30/413 (EP,US);
G06V30/10 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] |
Former [2020/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE ZEICHENERKENNUNGSFEHLERKORREKTUR BASIEREND AUF VISUELLEN UND TEXTINHALTEN | [2020/43] | English: | OPTICAL CHARACTER RECOGNITION ERROR CORRECTION BASED ON VISUAL AND TEXTUAL CONTENTS | [2020/43] | French: | CORRECTION D'ERREUR DE RECONNAISSANCE OPTIQUE DE CARACTÈRES SUR LA BASE DE CONTENUS VISUELS ET TEXTUELS | [2020/43] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 20.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/29] | 16.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - Viacheslav Khomenko ET AL, "Handwriting Text/Non-Text Classification on Mobile Device", Proceedings of The Fourth International Conference on Artificial Intelligence and Pattern Recognition (AIPR2017), (20170805), URL: https://www.researchgate.net/publication/323523432_Handwriting_TextNon-Text_Classification_on_Mobile_Device, (20200729), XP055718950 [A] 1-15 * Section 3.1;; figure 2 * * Section 3.2 * * Section 4.1;; figure 5 * | [A] - KARAOGLU SEZER ET AL, "Words Matter: Scene Text for Image Classification and Retrieval", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MULTIMEDIA, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, US, vol. 19, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TMM.2016.2638622, ISSN 1520-9210, (20170501), pages 1063 - 1076, (20170417), XP011646831 [A] 1-15 * see global workflow on Figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMM.2016.2638622 | [A] - BAI XIANG ET AL, "Text/non-text image classification in the wild with convolutional neural networks", PATTERN RECOGNITION, (20161211), vol. 66, doi:10.1016/J.PATCOG.2016.12.005, ISSN 0031-3203, pages 437 - 446, XP029943009 [A] 1 * see global workflow on Figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.patcog.2016.12.005 |