EP3708927 - TEMPERATURE CONTROLLED CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-Gu 07336 SEOUL / KR | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oh, Minkyu IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 20169413.0 | 23.11.2018 | [2020/38] | Priority number, date | KR20170161641 | 29.11.2017 Original published format: KR 20170161641 | [2020/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3708927 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3708927 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F25B21/02, F25D11/00, F25D3/00, F25D16/00 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
F25D3/005 (EP,US);
F25D31/005 (KR);
F25B21/02 (EP,KR,US);
F25D11/003 (US);
F25D11/006 (KR,US);
F25D16/00 (EP,US);
F25D17/06 (KR);
F25D23/065 (KR);
H10N10/10 (EP,US);
F25B2321/0211 (EP,US);
F25B2321/0212 (EP,US);
F25B2321/023 (KR,US);
F25B2321/0251 (EP,US);
F25D2317/063 (KR);
F25D2317/0681 (KR);
F25D2700/121 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Title | German: | TEMPERATURGESTEUERTER BEHÄLTER | [2020/38] | English: | TEMPERATURE CONTROLLED CONTAINER | [2020/38] | French: | CONTENEUR À TEMPÉRATURE RÉGULÉE | [2020/38] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 12.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18207936.8 / EP3492842 | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2018 | AL | 27.10.2021 | AT | 27.10.2021 | CY | 27.10.2021 | CZ | 27.10.2021 | DK | 27.10.2021 | EE | 27.10.2021 | ES | 27.10.2021 | FI | 27.10.2021 | HR | 27.10.2021 | LT | 27.10.2021 | LV | 27.10.2021 | MC | 27.10.2021 | NL | 27.10.2021 | PL | 27.10.2021 | RO | 27.10.2021 | RS | 27.10.2021 | SE | 27.10.2021 | SI | 27.10.2021 | SK | 27.10.2021 | SM | 27.10.2021 | IE | 23.11.2021 | LU | 23.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | BG | 27.01.2022 | NO | 27.01.2022 | GR | 28.01.2022 | IS | 27.02.2022 | PT | 28.02.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | [2023/35] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 23.11.2018 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 27.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9519533 (MARLOW IND INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 23, line 1 - line 17; figure 6b *; | [A]US2002162339 (HARRISON HOWARD R [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0064]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2004068992 (CAUCHY CHARLES J [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0023]; figure 2 *; | [A]FR2853400 (LUTRINGER PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005086947 (MINOURA ATSUSHI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0026]; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2006088413 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 2, line 16 - page 4, line 9; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2007000208 (IPV INHEIDENER PRODUKTIONS UND [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* page 10, line 28 - page 12, line 12; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]KR20140073137 (HALLA VISTEON CLIMATE CONTROL [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * figures 2,7 * | by applicant | KR200251824Y |