EP3736927 - CUTTING STATION AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY CUTTING GUIDE ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEONI Bordnetz-Systeme GmbH Flugplatzstraße 74 97318 Kitzingen / DE | [2020/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACHINGER, Markus c/o Abele Ingenieure GmbH Proviantbachstraße 30 86153 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
DUTZ, Jessica c/o Abele Ingenieure GmbH Proviantbachstraße 30 86153 Augsburg / DE | 03 /
SAULE, Johann c/o Abele Ingenieure GmbH Proviantbachstraße 30 86153 Augsburg / DE | 04 /
NEDOBIJCZUK, Andreas c/o Abele Ingenieure GmbH Proviantbachstraße 30 86153 Augsburg / DE | [2020/46] | Representative(s) | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2020/46] | Application number, filing date | 20170739.5 | 21.04.2020 | [2020/46] | Priority number, date | DE201910206243 | 30.04.2019 Original published format: DE102019206243 | [2020/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3736927 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3736927 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02G1/00, H01B13/00, H01R43/00, H02G1/12, H01R43/28 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
H02G1/005 (EP,US);
B21C51/00 (US);
B21F11/00 (US);
B26D7/02 (US);
B41F17/10 (US);
H01B13/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] |
Former [2020/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Validation states | MA | 05.03.2021 | TN | 05.03.2021 | Title | German: | ABLÄNGSTATION SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN ABLÄNGEN VON LEITUNGSELEMENTEN | [2020/46] | English: | CUTTING STATION AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY CUTTING GUIDE ELEMENTS | [2020/46] | French: | STATION DE DÉCOUPE AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCOUPE AUTOMATIQUE D'ÉLÉMENTS DE CONDUIT | [2020/46] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 17.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0137631 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 12 - page 7, line 25; figures 1,4; claims 1-3 *; | [A]DE19844416 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 49 - column 5, line 39; figures 5-12; claims 1-8 *; | [AD]DE102017206139 (UNIV FRIEDRICH ALEXANDER ER [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15* abstract * | by applicant | DE102017206139 |