EP3734997 - MEMBRANE FOR AN ACOUSTIC TRANSDUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hedd Audio GmbH Salzufer 13-14 10587 Berlin / DE | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heinz, Klaus c/o HEDD Audio GmbH Salzufer 13-14 10587 Berlin / DE | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2020/45] | Application number, filing date | 20172221.2 | 29.04.2020 | [2020/45] | Priority number, date | DE201910111578 | 03.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019111578 | [2020/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3734997 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04R9/04, H04R7/14 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
H04R9/046 (EP);
H04R7/14 (EP,US);
H04R1/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] |
Former [2020/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEMBRAN FÜR SCHALLWANDLER | [2020/45] | English: | MEMBRANE FOR AN ACOUSTIC TRANSDUCER | [2020/45] | French: | MEMBRANE POUR TRANSDUCTEURS ACOUSTIQUES | [2020/45] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 04.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1566337 (MARTIN WILLIAM H) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 8 - page 2, line 80; figures 3,5 *; | [X]US4473723 (HOBROUGH GILBERT L [CA]) [X] 1-10 * column 2, lines 53-66; figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO9907183 (ALSOP GLENN RONALD [AU], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 14, line 32 - page 15, line 5; figure 15 *; | [X]DE102004059067 (ELAC ELECTROACUSTIC GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10* paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0010] , [0011]; figure 1 * | by applicant | US3636278 | EP2158789 | EP2158789 |