EP3742071 - AIR CONDITIONING APPARATUS AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL, 07336 / KR | [2020/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Chiwoo LG Electronics Inc., IP Center 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | 02 /
SA, Yongcheol LG Electronics Inc., IP Center 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | 03 /
SHIN, Youngjoo LG Electronics Inc., IP Center 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | 04 /
SHIN, Ilyoong LG Electronics Inc., IP Center 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2020/48] | Application number, filing date | 20173850.7 | 11.05.2020 | [2020/48] | Priority number, date | KR20190060850 | 23.05.2019 Original published format: KR 20190060850 | [2020/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3742071 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3742071 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F25B1/00, F25B13/00, F24F5/00, F25B41/00, F25B29/00, F25B6/02, F25B5/02, F25B41/20 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
F25B5/02 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/67 (KR);
F24F1/32 (KR);
F24F11/49 (KR);
F24F11/84 (KR);
F24F5/0003 (KR);
F24F5/0007 (EP,KR);
F24F5/001 (KR);
F25B13/00 (EP,US);
F25B29/003 (EP,KR);
F25B41/20 (EP,US);
F25B41/26 (KR);
F25B41/40 (KR);
F25B6/02 (EP,KR);
F25B2313/003 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2313/007 (EP,KR);
F25B2313/0231 (EP,KR);
F25B2313/0233 (EP,US);
F25B2313/02331 (EP,KR);
F25B2313/02334 (EP,KR);
F25B2313/029 (US);
F25B2313/0312 (EP,KR);
F25B2313/0314 (EP,KR);
F25B2400/04 (EP);
F25B2500/12 (KR);
F25B2500/18 (EP,KR);
F25B2600/2515 (EP,KR);
F25B2600/2519 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/48] | F25B1/00, F25B5/02, F25B6/02, F25B29/00, F25B41/00, F25B41/04, F24F5/00, F25B13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] |
Former [2020/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KLIMATISIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/48] | English: | AIR CONDITIONING APPARATUS AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | [2020/48] | French: | APPAREIL DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2020/48] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 19.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.01.2024 | BG | 17.01.2024 | ES | 17.01.2024 | FI | 17.01.2024 | HR | 17.01.2024 | LT | 17.01.2024 | LV | 17.01.2024 | NL | 17.01.2024 | PL | 17.01.2024 | SE | 17.01.2024 | NO | 17.04.2024 | RS | 17.04.2024 | GR | 18.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | PT | 17.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 17.01.2024 | |
BG | 17.01.2024 | ||
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
LV | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
PL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
PT | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 17.01.2024 | |
BG | 17.01.2024 | ||
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 17.01.2024 | |
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 17.01.2024 | |
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 17.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2012118005 (YAMASHITA KOJI [JP], et al); | [XAI]EP2927614 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [XAI]JP2018124046 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) |