EP3739757 - OPTIMISED SENSOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG Steeger Straße 17 42551 Velbert / DE | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Löpke, Christian Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG Rembrandtstraße 35 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Jens Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG Lerchenweg 3 40699 Erkrath / DE | 03 /
Witte, Martin Melaniastraße 50 48683 Ahaus / DE | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Konrad-Zuse-Str. 4 44801 Bochum / DE | [2024/11] |
Former [2020/47] | Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 20174041.2 | 12.05.2020 | [2020/47] | Priority number, date | DE201910113098 | 17.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019113098 | [2020/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3739757 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3739757 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/96, H03K17/97 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
H03K17/96 (EP);
H03K17/965 (EP);
H03K2017/9706 (EP);
H03K2217/94026 (EP);
H03K2217/96038 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] |
Former [2020/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OPTIMIERTE SENSORVORRICHTUNG | [2020/47] | English: | OPTIMISED SENSOR DEVICE | [2020/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF CAPTEUR OPTIMISÉ | [2020/47] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 18.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.09.2023 | 26.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.11.2023 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23208106.7 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 08.12.2023 | EP24162625.8 / EP4358408 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 13.03.2024 | ES | 13.03.2024 | FI | 13.03.2024 | HR | 13.03.2024 | LT | 13.03.2024 | LV | 13.03.2024 | NL | 13.03.2024 | SE | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.06.2024 | RS | 13.06.2024 | GR | 14.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
SE | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 13.03.2024 | |
NO | 13.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102015109548 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]); | [XYI]US2016226521 (LIU DONGTAI [US]) | by applicant | DE102016122550 |