EP3738572 - BAG FOR THE TRANSFER OF CORPSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2021 [2021/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Limbo Disseny, S.L. Avda. Jean Claude Combaldieu, 5 03008 Alicante / ES | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Payá Cayuelas, Guillermo Avda. Jean Claude Combaldieu, 5 03008 Alicante / ES | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Ibarra Garcia, Isabel PADIMA Explanada de España 11,1° 03002 Alicante / ES | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 20174574.2 | 14.05.2020 | [2020/47] | Priority number, date | ES20190030819U | 16.05.2019 Original published format: ES 201930819 U | [2020/47] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3738572 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61G17/007, A61G17/06, B32B1/00 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
A61G17/06 (EP);
A61G17/0136 (EP);
B32B1/00 (EP);
B32B27/12 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/40 (EP);
B32B3/02 (EP);
B32B3/08 (EP);
B32B5/26 (EP);
A61G17/036 (EP);
B32B2262/062 (EP);
B32B2307/7163 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SACK FÜR DIE ÜBERFÜHRUNG VON LEICHEN | [2020/47] | English: | BAG FOR THE TRANSFER OF CORPSES | [2020/47] | French: | SAC POUR LE TRANSFERT DE CADAVRES | [2020/47] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/44] | 10.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]AT352269B (ANGERMANN SIEGFRIED [AT]) [Y] 1-3 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 40 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4780940 (JAY WILLIAM G [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 28 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO2009044204 (RESOMATION LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 17, line 16 - page 27, line 21 * * page 35, line 12 - page 38, line 19 ** figures 5-8, 14, 15 *; | [A]WO2010015853 (A W HAINSWORTH & SONS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 13 * * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]WO2012164134 (LIMBO DISSENY S L [ES], et al) [Y] 1-3 * page 8, line 26 - page 13, line 2 * * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | ES201130596U |