EP3739143 - AWNING WITH LATERAL GUIDE RAILS AND REINFORCEMENT PROFILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAREMA Renkhoff SE Hans-Wilhelm-Renkhoff-Strasse 2 97828 Markheidenfeld / DE | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANG, Thomas Hauptstraße 1 97909 Stadtprozelten / DE | 02 /
GREß, Manuel Hinter der Halle 6 97851 Rothenfels-Bergrothenfels / DE | 03 /
SCHENK, Thomas Wombacher Str. 128 97816 Lohr / DE | 04 /
SCHÄFER, Lena Massenbuch 1 97737 Gemünden / DE | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 20174905.8 | 15.05.2020 | [2020/47] | Priority number, date | DE201910112990 | 16.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019112990 | [2020/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3739143 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E04F10/06 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
E04F10/0607 (EP);
E04F10/0655 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] |
Former [2020/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MARKISE MIT SEITLICHEN FÜHRUNGSSCHIENEN UND VERSTÄRKUNGSPROFIL | [2020/47] | English: | AWNING WITH LATERAL GUIDE RAILS AND REINFORCEMENT PROFILE | [2020/47] | French: | STORE POURVU DE RAILS DE GUIDAGE LATÉRAUX ET PROFILÉ DE RENFORCEMENT | [2020/47] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 18.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS6013190 (METAKO KIGYO KK) [X] 1-3,5,7-10 * pages 2,3; figures 1-8 * [I] 4; | [A]JPH0475091U (-) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]US5186231 (LEWIS MILBURN [US]) [X] 1,2,9 * figures 1,2A,2B,2C * | by applicant | DE202018000966U | EP3312376 | EP3375970 |