EP3721815 - SURGICAL STAPLE AND DRIVER ARRANGEMENTS FOR STAPLE CARTRIDGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARRIS, Jason L. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 02 /
ZEINER, Mark S. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 03 /
SHELTON, IV, Frederick E. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 04 /
MORGAN, Jerome R. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2020/42] | Application number, filing date | 20177690.3 | 25.09.2015 | [2020/42] | Priority number, date | US201414498105 | 26.09.2014 Original published format: US201414498105 | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3721815 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3721815 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3721815 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
A61B17/0644 (EP,RU,US);
A61B17/105 (US);
A61B17/068 (RU,US);
A61B17/0682 (RU,US);
A61B17/0684 (US);
A61B17/072 (RU,US);
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/07292 (EP,US);
A61B17/1155 (EP,US);
A61B17/1222 (US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00884 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00898 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00942 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0688 (US);
A61B2017/07214 (US);
A61B2017/07228 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07235 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07242 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0725 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07264 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07271 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07278 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] |
Former [2020/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE KLAMMER UND TREIBERANORDNUNGEN FÜR KLAMMERMAGAZINE | [2020/42] | English: | SURGICAL STAPLE AND DRIVER ARRANGEMENTS FOR STAPLE CARTRIDGES | [2020/42] | French: | AGRAFE CHIRURGICALE ET SYSTÈMES DE POUSSOIR POUR CARTOUCHES D'AGRAFES | [2020/42] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 20.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15186913.8 / EP3000410 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2116197 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [X] 1,4-10 * figures 10,5a,11 * * paragraph [0086] ** paragraph [0085] *; | [A]US2012241505 (ALEXANDER III JOHNNY H [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 7-14, 50-53, 46-49 * * paragraph [0638] * * paragraph [0603] * * paragraph [0639] * * paragraph [0640] * * paragraph [0643] *; | [A]US2012248169 (WIDENHOUSE TAMARA [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 9-11, 46-49 * * paragraph [0570] * * paragraph [0565] * * paragraph [0568] * * paragraph [0571] * * paragraph [0572] * * paragraph [0564] * * paragraph [0566] *; | [A]US2012318844 (SHELTON IV FREDERICK E [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0703]; figure 54 *; | [A]EP2757965 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0032]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0034] *; | [A]US2014252068 (SHELTON IV FREDERICK E [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0671]; figure 283 *; | [A]EP2777533 (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0033]; figures 3a, 55 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0094] *; | [AP]US2015034696 (SHELTON IV FREDERICK E [US], et al) [AP] 1-10 * paragraph [0484]; figures 9-11 * | by applicant | US5104025 | US5309927 | US5403312 | US7000818 | US2007175955 | US7422139 | US7464849 | US7635074 | US7641091 | US7665647 | US7670334 | US7726537 | US7753245 | US7794475 | US2010264194 | US7845537 | US7866528 | US7980443 | US7997469 | US8210411 | US8220688 | US8308040 | US2012298719 | US8393514 | US2013168435 | US8496683 | US8561870 | US8608045 | US2013334278 | US2014042205 | US8668130 | US8733613 | US8827133 | - Q. CHEN, "ELASTOMERIC BIOMATERIALS FOR TISSUE ENGINEERING", Progress In Polymer Science, (20130000), vol. 38, doi:10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2012.05.003, pages 584 - 671, XP028982995 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2012.05.003 | - WILLIAM G. PITT, "ATTACHMENT OF HYALURONAN TO METALLIC SURFACES", J. Biomed. Mater. Res., (20040000), vol. 68A, pages 95 - 106 | - LUIS SOLORIO, "GELATIN MICROSPHERES CROSS-LINKED WITH GENIPIN FOR LOCAL DELIVERY OF GROWTH FACTORS", J. Tissue Eng. Regen. Med., (20100000), vol. 4, pages 514 - 523 | US20120893461 | US20080031573 | US20080031873 | US20080235782 | US20080249117 | US20080343803 | US20090647100 |