EP3811900 - ARTIFICIAL STOMACH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Implantica Patent Ltd. Ideon Science Park 223 70 Lund / SE | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Forsell, Peter c/o Implantica Patents Ltd Ideon Science Park 223 70 Lund / SE | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/17] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 20180241.0 | 12.10.2009 | [2021/17] | Priority number, date | SE20080002160 | 10.10.2008 Original published format: SE 0802160 | US20090227815P | 23.07.2009 Original published format: US 227815 P | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3811900 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/04, A61B5/0205, A61B5/07, A61B5/11, A61F5/00, A61N1/08 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
A61F2/04 (EP,US);
A61B5/02055 (EP,US);
A61B5/076 (EP,US);
A61B5/1107 (EP,US);
A61F2002/045 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0033 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] |
Former [2021/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KÜNSTLICHER MAGEN | [2021/17] | English: | ARTIFICIAL STOMACH | [2021/17] | French: | ESTOMAC ARTIFICIEL | [2021/17] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 28.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09819519.1 / EP2349083 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004122526 (IMRAN MIR A [US]) [Y] 4,5 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0071]; figures 1-5 *; | [XAY]EP1555970 (VALENTX INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6-12 * paragraph [0126] - paragraph [0172]; figures 25-32 * [A] 13-15 [Y] 4,5; | [A]WO2007053556 (ABDOMINUS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15* page 9 - page 13; figures 1-2 * | by applicant | US19900609607 | US19910609607 |