EP3757880 - ELECTRONIC METHOD AND DEVICE FOR VERIFYING A CHARACTER TO BE DISPLAYED ON A SCREEN RELATIVE TO A REFERENCE CHARACTER, COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT AND ASSOCIATED GRAPHIC PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles - Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINE, Alexandre c/o THALES AVIONICS CAMPUS THALES BORDEAUX 75-77 avenue Marcel Dassault 33700 MERIGNAC / FR | 02 /
NETO, Philippe c/o THALES AVIONICS CAMPUS THALES BORDEAUX 75-77 avenue Marcel Dassault 33700 MERIGNAC / FR | 03 /
ROUZES, Siegfried c/o THALES AVIONICS CAMPUS THALES BORDEAUX 75-77 avenue Marcel Dassault 33700 MERIGNAC / FR | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 20182084.2 | 24.06.2020 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | FR20190006865 | 25.06.2019 Original published format: FR 1906865 | [2021/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3757880 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/03, G06K9/62 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
G06V20/63 (EP,US);
G06T1/20 (CN);
G06T3/60 (CN);
G06T7/60 (CN);
G06V30/19067 (EP,US);
G09G5/24 (US);
G09G5/32 (US);
G09G5/363 (US);
G06V30/10 (EP,US);
G09G2340/045 (US);
G09G2340/0464 (US);
G09G2340/0492 (US);
G09G2380/12 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERPRÜFUNG EINES AUF EINEM BILDSCHIRM ANZUZEIGENDEN ZEICHENS IM VERGLEICH ZU EINEM REFERENZZEICHEN, COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT UND ENTSPRECHENDER GRAFISCHER PROZESSOR | [2021/01] | English: | ELECTRONIC METHOD AND DEVICE FOR VERIFYING A CHARACTER TO BE DISPLAYED ON A SCREEN RELATIVE TO A REFERENCE CHARACTER, COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT AND ASSOCIATED GRAPHIC PROCESSOR | [2021/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE DE VÉRIFICATION D'UN CARACTÈRE À AFFICHER SUR UN ÉCRAN PAR RAPPORT À UN CARACTÈRE DE RÉFÉRENCE, PRODUIT PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR, ET PROCESSEUR GRAPHIQUE ASSOCIÉ | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 09.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002105515 (MOCHIZUKI YOSHIYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0117]; figure 3 *; | [A]JP2016076093 (FUJITSU LTD, et al) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0291] * |