EP3702504 - WARP KNITTING MACHINE, SLIDING-TONGUE NEEDLE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ELASTIC WARP KNIT FABRIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/36] | WARP KNITTING MACHINE, SLIDER NEEDLE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR MAKING ELASTIC KNITTED FABRIC | ||
[2022/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KARL MAYER STOLL R&D GmbH Industriestraße 1 63179 Obertshausen / DE | [2020/42] |
Former [2020/36] | For all designated states KARL MAYER R&D GmbH Brühlstraße 25 63179 Obertshausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANDL, Klaus Wilhelmstraße 11 63512 Hainburg / DE | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/36] | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 20183097.3 | 30.06.2020 | [2020/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3702504 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3702504 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3702504 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | D04B21/18, D04B23/06, D04B35/06 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
D04B35/06 (EP,KR);
D04B27/06 (KR);
D04B35/02 (CN);
D04B21/18 (EP,CN,KR);
D04B23/06 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] |
Former [2020/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KETTENWIRKMASCHINE, SCHIEBERNADELANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER ELASTISCHEN WIRKWARE | [2020/36] | English: | WARP KNITTING MACHINE, SLIDING-TONGUE NEEDLE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ELASTIC WARP KNIT FABRIC | [2022/22] | French: | MÉTIER À TRICOTER CHAÎNE, SYSTÈME D'AIGUILLE À COULISSE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE ÉTOFFE TRICOTÉE ÉLASTIQUE | [2022/22] |
Former [2020/36] | WARP KNITTING MACHINE, SLIDER NEEDLE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR MAKING ELASTIC KNITTED FABRIC | ||
Former [2020/36] | MÉTIER À TRICOTER EN CHAÎNE, AGENCEMENT D'AIGUILLES COULISSANTES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PRODUIT TRICOTÉ ÉLASTIQUE | Examination procedure | 01.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 01.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.09.2022 | CZ | 07.09.2022 | DK | 07.09.2022 | EE | 07.09.2022 | ES | 07.09.2022 | FI | 07.09.2022 | HR | 07.09.2022 | LT | 07.09.2022 | LV | 07.09.2022 | MC | 07.09.2022 | NL | 07.09.2022 | PL | 07.09.2022 | RO | 07.09.2022 | RS | 07.09.2022 | SE | 07.09.2022 | SI | 07.09.2022 | SK | 07.09.2022 | SM | 07.09.2022 | NO | 07.12.2022 | GR | 08.12.2022 | IS | 07.01.2023 | PT | 09.01.2023 | [2024/09] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
DK | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
DK | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | CZ | 07.09.2022 | |
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 07.09.2022 | |
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 07.09.2022 | |
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE2245731 (MAYER & CIE MASCHINENFABRIK) [X] 1,2,7,8 * page 11, line 27 - page 12, line 6; figures 1-10 * [A] 3,5,9,11-15 [I] 4,6,10; | [A]DE3008276 (LIBA MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1-15* figures 1, 2 *; | [XAI]DE4025132 (KARL MAYER TEXTILMASCHINENFABRIK GMBH) [X] 1,3,7,9,11,13 * column 2, lines 22-26; figure 1 * * column 3, lines 3-6 * * column 4, lines 9-11 * [A] 2,8 [I] 4-6,10,12,14,15; | [A]DE19621382 (BERGER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 3 * | Examination | DE2537502 | DE2919344 |