EP3764429 - ANALYSIS METHOD FOR CRACK RATE OF ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL OF ELECTRODE FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states LG Energy Solution Ltd. Tower 1, 108 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu 07335 Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2021/02] | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Jung Hoon LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu 34122 Daejeon / KR | 02 /
BAEK, Joo Yul LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu 34122 Daejeon / KR | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 20183872.9 | 03.07.2020 | [2021/02] | Priority number, date | KR20190083129 | 10.07.2019 Original published format: KR 20190083129 | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3764429 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/02, G01N1/30, G01N23/2202, G01N23/2252, H01M4/13, H01M4/62 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
H01M4/621 (EP);
G01N23/2251 (KR);
G06T7/0004 (US);
G01N1/04 (KR);
G01N1/44 (US);
G01N23/2202 (EP);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M4/02 (EP);
H01M4/0416 (US);
H01M4/0447 (KR);
H01M4/13 (EP);
H01M4/139 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] |
Former [2021/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANALYSEVERFAHREN FÜR DIE RISSRATE EINES ELEKTRODENAKTIVMATERIALS EINER ELEKTRODE FÜR EINE LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2021/02] | English: | ANALYSIS METHOD FOR CRACK RATE OF ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL OF ELECTRODE FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY | [2021/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE DU TAUX DE FISSURES DE MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM | [2021/02] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 29.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]KR20170006663 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-6 * figures, [0025] *; | [Y]KR20180005060 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-6 * figures, [0013]ff *; | [Y]WO2018221929 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-6 * figures, [0031]ff *; | [T] - "Why Magnification is Irrelevant in Modern Scanning Electron Microscopes Application Note Introduction", (20110705), URL: http://www.toyo.co.jp/files/user/img/product/microscopy/pdf/5990-8594EN.pdf, (20151021), XP055222489 [T] * the whole document * | [T] - EXNER, Messen und Ausgabe, EINFÜHRUNG IN DIE QUANTITATIVE GEFÜGEANALYSE, DEUTSCHE GESELLSCHAFT FÜR METALLKUNDE, PAGE(S) 75 - 76, (19860101), ISBN 978-3-88355-108-1, XP009186786 [T] * the whole document * | [T] - N.N., "SamplePreparationTechniquesforMicroscopic AnalysisinMetallurgy Sample Preparation Techniques for Microscopic Analysis in Metallurgy", (20140307), URL: https://www.azom.com/article.aspx?ArticleID=10711, (20201029), XP055745014 [T] * the whole document * | [T] - N.N., "GrainSizeAnalysis-Electron Backscatter Diffraction, Channelling ContrastImaging and OtherTechniques", (20021011), URL: https://www.azom.com/article.aspx?ArticleID=1694, (20201029), XP055745022 [T] * the whole document * | by applicant | - Journal of the Electrochemical Society, vol. 158, page 6 |