EP3763511 - DEVICE FOR APPLYING LAYERS OF PASTE FOR A MACHINE FOR MANUFACTURING CERAMIC PARTS BY STEREOLITHOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.A.S 3DCeram-Sinto 27 Rue du Petit Theil 87280 Limoges / FR | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAPUT, Christophe 36 rue du Chatenet 87410 Le-Palais-sur-Vienne / FR | 02 /
GAIGNON, Richard 49 domaine du champ du Coq 91770 Saint-Vrain / FR | 03 /
NGUYEN, Marc 23 Chemin de Puy Mery 87110 Le Vigen / FR | 04 /
ROUSSELET, Nicolas 12 rue Léon Roby 87000 LIMOGES / FR | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Chaillot 16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 20184564.1 | 07.07.2020 | [2021/02] | Priority number, date | FR20190007636 | 08.07.2019 Original published format: FR 1907636 | [2021/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3763511 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/214, B29C64/236, B33Y30/00 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
B29C64/214 (EP,RU,US);
B28B11/10 (KR);
B28B1/001 (CN,US);
B28B11/24 (KR);
B29C64/135 (RU,US);
B29C64/236 (EP,RU);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFBRINGEN VON PASTENARTIGEN SCHICHTEN FÜR EINE MASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KERAMIKGEGENSTÄNDEN MITHILFE VON STEREOLITHOGRAPHIE | [2021/02] | English: | DEVICE FOR APPLYING LAYERS OF PASTE FOR A MACHINE FOR MANUFACTURING CERAMIC PARTS BY STEREOLITHOGRAPHY | [2021/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'APPLICATION DE COUCHES DE PÂTE POUR UNE MACHINE DE FABRICATION DE PIÈCES CÉRAMIQUES PAR STÉRÉOLITHOGRAPHIE | [2021/02] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 08.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/47] | 08.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP1270185 (3D SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,11 * figure 1 * * figure 2 * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0070] * [A] 7,8 [I] 4,10; | [XAI]CN108724722 (KUNSHAN KENDA MACHINERY CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4-6,9 * figure - * * claim - * [A] 3,7,8 [I] 10,11; | [A]WO03086726 (GENERIS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * claim - * * page 7, line 4 - page 16, line 10 * * figure - * | by applicant | US6764636 |