EP3764691 - PROCESSING RADIO COEXISTENCE INFORMATION DURING A HANDOVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Lieshout, Gert Jan Communications House South Street Staines, Middlesex TW18 4QE / GB | 02 /
Van der Velde, Himke Communications House South Street Staines, Middlesex TW18 4QE / GB | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 20186988.0 | 22.08.2012 | [2021/02] | Priority number, date | GB20110014476 | 22.08.2011 Original published format: GB 201114476 | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3764691 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00, H04W4/06, H04W8/22 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
H04W8/22 (EP,CN,US);
H04W24/10 (CN,GB,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04W36/005 (EP,US);
H04W36/0058 (EP,CN,GB,US);
H04W36/0079 (EP,CN,GB,US);
H04W4/06 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/04 (US);
H04W8/245 (CN);
H04L12/189 (US);
H04W36/0064 (EP,CN,GB);
H04W36/08 (EP,CN,GB);
H04W84/047 (GB)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] |
Former [2021/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERARBEITUNG VON MEHRFACHFUNK-KOEXISTENZINFORMATION WÄHREND DES WEITERREICHENS | [2021/02] | English: | PROCESSING RADIO COEXISTENCE INFORMATION DURING A HANDOVER | [2021/02] | French: | INFORMATIONS D'UNE COEXISTENCE MULTIRADIO PENDANT D'UN TRANSFERT INTERCELLULAIRE | [2021/02] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 23.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12825686.4 / EP2749066 | EP17168245.3 / EP3223557 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2182758 (HTC CORP [TW]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0032]; figure 7 *; | [A] - CMCC ET AL, "Discussion on indication of coexistence interference", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-111251 DISCUSSION ON INDICATION OF COEXISTENCE INTERFERENCE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110215), vol. RAN WG2, no. Taipei, Taiwan; 20110221, XP050493744 [A] 1-15 * paragraph 2.1 - column 2.3; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP2749066 |