EP3764153 - METHOD FOR COMPENSATING IMAGE QUALITY OF OPTICAL SYSTEM BY MEANS OF LENS ADJUSTMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2024 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ningbo Sunny Opotech Co., Ltd. 66-68 Shunyu Road Yuyao City Ningbo, Zhejiang 315400 / CN | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chunmei LIU Ningbo Sunny Opotech Co., Ltd. 66-68 Shunyu Road Yuyao City Ningbo, Zhejiang 315400 / CN | 02 /
Yiqi WANG Ningbo Sunny Opotech Co., Ltd. 66-68 Shunyu Road Yuyao City Ningbo, Zhejiang 315400 / CN | 03 /
Nan GUO Ningbo Sunny Opotech Co., Ltd. 66-68 Shunyu Road Yuyao City Ningbo, Zhejiang 315400 / CN | 04 /
Mingzhu WANG Ningbo Sunny Opotech Co., Ltd. 66-68 Shunyu Road Yuyao City Ningbo, Zhejiang 315400 / CN | 05 /
Hailong LIAO Ningbo Sunny Opotech Co., Ltd. 66-68 Shunyu Road Yuyao City Ningbo, Zhejiang 315400 / CN | 06 /
Huaigan ZHUANG Ningbo Sunny Opotech Co., Ltd. 66-68 Shunyu Road Yuyao City Ningbo, Zhejiang 315400 / CN | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Gong, Jinping CocreateIP Neumarkterstr. 21 81673 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/02] | Gong, Jinping CocreateIP Eggenfeldenerstraße 56 81929 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20189141.3 | 16.12.2016 | [2021/02] | Priority number, date | CN201510942802 | 16.12.2015 Original published format: CN201510942802 | [2021/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3764153 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/64, H04N5/232, G03B3/02, G03B5/00, G03B5/02, G03B5/04, G03B5/06, G03B5/08, H04N5/225, G02B7/00, G02B7/02, G02B13/00, G02B27/00, G03B43/00 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
G03B43/00 (EP);
G02B27/646 (CN);
G02B27/0068 (EP);
G02B7/023 (EP);
G02B13/001 (EP);
G02B7/003 (EP);
G03B3/02 (EP);
G03B5/00 (EP);
H04N23/55 (EP);
H04N25/615 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KOMPENSATION DER BILDQUALITÄT EINES OPTISCHEN SYSTEMS DURCH EINSTELLUNG DER LINSE | [2021/02] | English: | METHOD FOR COMPENSATING IMAGE QUALITY OF OPTICAL SYSTEM BY MEANS OF LENS ADJUSTMENT | [2021/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMPENSATION DE LA QUALITÉ D'IMAGE D'UN SYSTÈME OPTIQUE AU MOYEN D'UN RÉGLAGE DE LA LENTILLE | [2021/02] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 13.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.03.2024 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16874911.7 / EP3392699 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012013760 (PARODI-KERAVEC PIERRE-JEAN [FR], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0081] - [0089]; figures 9, 10, 18, 19 *; | [A]JP2013198053 (SHARP KK) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0 18] - [0045] *; | [A]US2015350497 (GAMADIA MARK N [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0138] - [0153]; figures 3-5,11 *; | [XI] - Julie Bentley ET AL, "Optical Design Process", Field Guide to Lens Design, SPIE, (20121207), doi:10.1117/3.934997.ch3, ISBN 978-0-8194-9165-7, XP055748962 [X] 9 * the whole document * [I] 1-8,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/3.934997.ch3 |