EP3783577 - CHECKOUT SYSTEM AND CHECKOUT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 1-11-1, Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8562 / JP | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAMOTO, Tsuyoshi c/o IP Division, Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 1-11-1, Osaki Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-8562 / JP | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/08] | Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 20190019.8 | 07.08.2020 | [2021/08] | Priority number, date | JP20190152311 | 22.08.2019 Original published format: JP 2019152311 | [2021/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3783577 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G07G1/00, G06Q20/18 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
G07G1/0009 (EP);
G06Q30/0601 (CN);
G06Q20/202 (US);
G06F16/2282 (CN);
G06K7/1413 (US);
G06Q20/18 (EP);
G06Q20/201 (US);
G06Q20/203 (US);
G06Q20/204 (US);
G06Q20/208 (EP);
G06Q20/322 (EP);
G06Q20/3276 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0633 (CN);
G07G1/0036 (EP);
G07G1/0081 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] |
Former [2021/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KASSENSYSTEM UND KASSENVERFAHREN | [2021/08] | English: | CHECKOUT SYSTEM AND CHECKOUT METHOD | [2021/08] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CAISSE | [2021/08] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 24.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.03.2024 | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/29] | 13.03.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/29] | 14.03.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002178088 (LURIE LEIB A [US], et al); | [A]US2012041845 (ROTHSCHILD LEIGH M [US]); | [I]US2013254114 (SMITH GRAEME [GB]); | [A]JP2017054531 (TOSHIBA TEC KK) |