EP3974809 - MICROCUVETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bioanalyt GmbH Rheinstrasse 17 14513 Teltow / DE | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWEIGERT, Florian 12205 Berlin / DE | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 20198949.8 | 29.09.2020 | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3974809 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/03 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
G01N21/03 (EP);
B01L3/502707 (EP);
B01L2200/0684 (EP);
B01L2300/0816 (EP);
B01L2300/168 (EP);
B01L2400/0406 (EP);
B01L3/502723 (EP);
G01N2021/0346 (EP);
G01N2021/0389 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROKÜVETTE | [2022/13] | English: | MICROCUVETTE | [2022/13] | French: | MICROCUVETTE | [2022/13] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/11] | 27.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US5674457 (WILLIAMSSON ANDERS [SE], et al) [XD] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 14 *; | [XD]EP2745779 (BODITECHMED INC [KR]) [XD] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0015] , [0034] , [0035] *; | [X]US2014176939 (SHAH NILESH DINBANDHU [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] - [0033] - [0038] , [0049] *; | [X]FR3048777 (ARCHIMEJ TECH [FR]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 8, line 5 - page 9, line 3 * * page 12, lines 13-23 * * page 13, lines 15-17 * | by applicant | US4088448 | US5674457 | EP2745779 | EP2876428 |