EP3806492 - PASSIVE THERMAL-CONTROL SYSTEM OF A MESH NETWORK DEVICE AND ASSOCIATED MESH NETWORK DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heckmann, Frédéric Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA California 94043 / US | 02 /
Ihab, Ali Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA California 94043 / US | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 20200820.7 | 08.10.2020 | [2021/15] | Priority number, date | US201962913342P | 10.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962913342 P | US202017064372 | 06.10.2020 Original published format: US202017064372 | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3806492 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04R9/02, H04R9/06, H05K7/20 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
H05K7/20509 (EP);
H05K7/2039 (CN);
H04R9/022 (EP);
H04R9/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] |
Former [2021/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PASSIVES THERMISCHES STEUERUNGSSYSTEM EINER MESH-NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGE MESH-NETZWERKVORRICHTUNGEN | [2021/15] | English: | PASSIVE THERMAL-CONTROL SYSTEM OF A MESH NETWORK DEVICE AND ASSOCIATED MESH NETWORK DEVICES | [2021/15] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CONTRÔLE THERMIQUE PASSIF D'UN DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU MAILLÉ ET DISPOSITIFS DE RÉSEAU MAILLÉ ASSOCIÉS | [2021/15] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 10.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2015382448 (PENNATHUR SHANKAR S [US], et al) [I] 1,3-7,13 * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0065] * * figures 1A-3B,7D * [Y] 2,13-15; | [XYI]US2019104640 (CHANG RICHARD TZEWEI [US], et al) [X] 8-10 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0046] * * figures 3-7 * [Y] 2,13-15[I] 1,11,12 |