EP3812695 - GAUGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place, 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/17] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burton, Jonathan c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | 02 /
Hook, David c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 20201244.9 | 12.10.2020 | [2021/17] | Priority number, date | GB20190015424 | 24.10.2019 Original published format: GB 201915424 | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3812695 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01B3/50, G01B3/46 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
G01B3/50 (EP);
G01B3/46 (EP,US);
F02C7/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MESSGERÄT | [2021/17] | English: | GAUGE | [2021/17] | French: | JAUGE | [2021/17] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/14] | 19.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2018139002 (KNOWLEDGE MFG COMPANY [JP]) [X] 1,2,7-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0050] * * figures 1, 3-5, 8 * [A] 3-6 [I] 15; | [XAI]US2010192394 (CHENG TAM CHOI KEM SUSAN [CN], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0061] * * figures 9-13 * [A] 8-10,13,14 [I] 11,12,15; | [I]US3660928 (MICHEL JORGE PICAZO) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 63 - column 3, line 41 * * figures 1-11 * |