EP3975277 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING A DISPERSION OF NON-STOECHIOMETRIC NICKEL OXIDE NANOPARTICLES IN ALCOHOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universite d'Aix-Marseille Jardin du Pharo 58, boulevard Charles Livon 13007 Marseille / FR | For all designated states Centre national de la recherche scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARGEAT, Olivier 13008 MARSEILLE / FR | 02 /
AKERMANN, Jorg 13008 MARSEILLE / FR | 03 /
ALKARSIFI, Riva 36000 Pessac / FR | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 20306089.2 | 24.09.2020 | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3975277 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/00, H01L51/48 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
H10K71/15 (EP);
H10K30/211 (EP);
Y02E10/549 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DISPERSION VON NICHTSTÖCHIOMETRISCHEN NICKELOXID-NANOPARTIKELN IN ALKOHOL | [2022/13] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING A DISPERSION OF NON-STOECHIOMETRIC NICKEL OXIDE NANOPARTICLES IN ALCOHOL | [2022/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE DISPERSION DE NANOPARTICULES D'OXYDE DE NICKEL NON ST CHIOMÉTRIQUES DANS L'ALCOOL | [2022/13] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/11] | 25.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - ZHANG JUN ET AL, "Efficient and stable polymer solar cells with annealing-free solution-processible NiO nanoparticles as anode buffer layers", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY C, GB, (20140903), vol. 2, no. 39, doi:10.1039/C4TC01302F, ISSN 2050-7526, pages 8295 - 8302, XP055780785 [X] 14 * page 8296, column 1, lines 19,50 - column 2, lines 13, 14, 16-51 * [Y] 1-12,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C4TC01302F | [Y] - Riva Alkarsifi, "Synthèses et caractérisations de nanomatériaux composites comme couches interfaciales dans les cellules solaires organiques et hybrides", (20191219), URL: https://ecole-doctorale-250.univ-amu.fr/fr/soutenance/904, (20210301), XP055780846 [Y] 1-12,15 * page 4, lines 10-14 * | [X] - LIM DONG-CHAN ET AL, "Wet-Chemically Prepared NiO Layers as Hole Transport Layer in the Inverted Organic Solar Cell", BULLETIN OF THE KOREAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, KR, (20110320), vol. 32, no. 3, doi:10.5012/bkcs.2011.32.3.1067, ISSN 0253-2964, pages 1067 - 1070, XP055781130 [X] 13 * page 1067, column 2, lines 3-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5012/bkcs.2011.32.3.1067 | [Y] - HUANG SHUAI ET AL, "Enhancing the performance of polymer solar cells using solution-processed copper doped nickel oxide nanoparticles as hole transport layer", JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, ACADEMIC PRESS,INC, US, (20181006), vol. 535, doi:10.1016/J.JCIS.2018.10.013, ISSN 0021-9797, pages 308 - 317, XP085537951 [Y] 10-12 * figure 3(a) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcis.2018.10.013 | by applicant | - WAGNER et al., Synth. Met., (20130000), vol. 181, pages 64 - 71 | - WALLACE et al., Adv. Mater., (20150000), vol. 27, pages 2930 - 2937 | - LU et al., Chem. Rev., (20150000), vol. 115, pages 12666 - 12731 | - F. JIANG et al., Adv. Mater. Deerfield Beach Fla, (20150000), vol. 27, pages 2930 - 2937 |