blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4016321

EP4016321 - CREATING A TREE OF DATABASE STATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.01.2025
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.12.2022
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  20.05.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2025New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
17.01.2025First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dassault Systèmes
10, rue Marcel Dassault
78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR
[2022/25]
Inventor(s)01 / SAHUT D'IZARN, Jean-Philippe
78946 Vélizy-Villacoublay Cedex / FR
02 / VALLET GLENISSON, Eric
78946 Vélizy-Villacoublay Cedex / FR
03 / LABBATE, Frédéric
78946 Vélizy-Villacoublay Cedex / FR
04 / ROULLIER, Alban
78946 Vélizy-Villacoublay Cedex / FR
 [2022/25]
Representative(s)Bandpay & Greuter
11 rue Christophe Colomb
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2022/25]Bandpay & Greuter
30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires
75002 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date20306644.421.12.2020
[2022/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4016321
Date:22.06.2022
Language:EN
[2022/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.2021
ClassificationIPC:G06F16/21, G06F16/23
[2022/25]
CPC:
G06F16/219 (EP,CN,US); G06F16/21 (CN); G06F11/1469 (US);
G06F16/23 (CN); G06F16/2358 (EP); G06F16/2365 (EP);
G06F16/2455 (CN); G06F2201/80 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/05]
Former [2022/25]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ERSTELLUNG EINES BAUMS VON DATENBANKZUSTÄNDEN[2022/25]
English:CREATING A TREE OF DATABASE STATES[2022/25]
French:CRÉATION D'UNE ARBORESCENCE D'ÉTATS DE BASE DE DONNÉES[2022/25]
Examination procedure22.12.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.12.2022Examination requested  [2023/05]
22.12.2022Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.01.2025Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2025Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2013144720  (KINAXIS INC [CA]);
 [A]US2014040199  (GOLAB WOJCLECH [US], et al);
 [A]US2018307570  (THOMSEN DIRK [DE]);
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.