EP3908805 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRACKING A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität München Arcisstr. 21 80333 München / DE | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIPELIDIS, Georgios Guardinistraße 121 81375 München / DE | 02 /
TSIAMITROS, Nikolaos Karl-Theodor-Straße 54 80803 München / DE | 03 /
PREHOFER, Christian Bozener Str. 22 82319 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
PIPELIDIS, Georgios 81375 München / DE | ||
02 /
TSIAMITROS, Nikolaos 80803 München / DE | |||
03 /
PREHOFER, Christian 82319 Starnberg / DE | Representative(s) | Lucke, Andreas Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 20700140.5 | 10.01.2020 | [2021/46] | WO2020EP50584 | Priority number, date | EP20190151114 | 10.01.2019 Original published format: EP 19151114 | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020144353 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3908805 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/20, G05D1/02 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
G01C21/206 (EP,US);
G01S5/0278 (EP,US);
H04W4/027 (EP,US);
H04W4/029 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERFOLGUNG EINER MOBILEN VORRICHTUNG | [2021/46] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRACKING A MOBILE DEVICE | [2021/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE SUIVI D'UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 06.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]GB2520751 (CAMBRIDGE CONSULTANTS [GB]) [AD] 1-31 * page 8, line 23 - page 16, line 25; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]EP2909582 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-31* paragraphs [0011] - [0015] - [ 0023] , [ 0075] * |